Broadus v. DeCesaro et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Broadus
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro, Chapdelain, CHP, Giles, Raymond Higgins, Robert Keisel, Eva Little, Luyando, Denny Owens, Jamie Soucie, Swingle, Thode, Jamey VanMeter and Kenneth Wildenstein
Case Number: 1:2015cv00182
Filed: January 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Denying Defendant CHP's 216 Motion for Costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/22/2019. (angar, )
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion for Summary Judgment: 1. Defendant CHP's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 114) is GRANTED; 2. The CDOC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 118) is GRANTED as to Defendants Chapdelaine, Little, and Luyando, but DENIED as to Defendants Giles and Thode; 3. At the conclusion of this case, final judgment will enter in favor of Defendants CHP, Chapdelaine, Little, and Luyand o; and 4. As against defendants Giles and Thode, this matter REMAINS SET for a Final Trial Preparation Conference on March 30, 2018, and a jury trial beginning on April 16, 2018, but that trial is now shortened to four days. At the Final Trial Preparation Conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss whether a trial against Giles and Thode could be completed in an even shorter time. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/15/2018. (wjmlc1)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING FROM PLAINTIFF by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/18/2018. (wjmlc1)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's first [Motion for] Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to Fed. R. CV. P. Rule 65 49 is DENIED as moot. Defendant shall file a Response to the Second Motion 73 in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/2/16.(morti, )
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Amended ORDER re: 51 Order on Report and Recommendations and Motion to Dismiss. Order Adopting 40 January 21, 2016 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 23 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/04/2016. (cthom, )
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 40 Report and Recommendations in it's entirety; and granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. Any claim for damages asserted by Plaintiff against any Defendant in his or her off icial capacity is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and Plaintiffs claims against Defendants DeCesaro, Higgins, Keisel, Owens, Soucie, VanMeter, Walker, Wildenstein, John Does 14, and Jane Does 12 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/03/2016.(cthom, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER; 28 Plaintiff's Emergency Injunction is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may make his request again by filing the entirety of his written motion, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/9/15.(morti, )
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/7/15. (dkals, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/29/2015. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadus v. DeCesaro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Broadus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapdelain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Keisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luyando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Soucie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamey VanMeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Wildenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?