Neilsen v. Connaghan, et al
Plaintiff: Stone, Thomas Neilsen, Dustin Upchurch and Jonathan Stone
Defendant: Amaya, Aaron Amaya, Allison Boyd, Amy Fitch, Jessica Meza, Maggie M. McElderry, Rick Raemisch, Jessica Curtis, Angel Weant, Nancy Johnson, John Odenheimer, Missy Gursky, Denise Balazic, Cheryl Davies, Richard Bednarski, Cook, Erin Jemison, A. Mervyn Davies, Marcelo Kopcow, Mary Baydarian, William Hildebrand, Tom Leversee, Genie Connaghan, Brandon Mathews, John O'Dell, Alfredo Pena, Dianna Lwyer-Brook, Jeff Jenks, Carl Blake, Rebecca Oakes, Jeff Geist, Doug Stephens, Alexandra Walker, Joe Morales and Mimi Scheuermann
Case Number: 1:2017cv00617
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
2 Judge: Michael J Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Filing 65 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants, Genie Connaghan, Rick Raemisch, and Maggie M. McElderry and against Plaintiff, Thomas Neilsen re #64 Order Affirming and Adopting in Part the February 14, 2018 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Clerk on 3/7/2018. (swest)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Affirming and Adopting in Part the February 14, 2018 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/7/2018. (swest)
February 28, 2018 Filing 63 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Thomas Neilsen. (DeFranco, Ingrid)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED ORDER: The parties shall file a Status Report on or before 2/28/2018 informing the Court as to whether Plaintiff Neilsen is currently living with his spouse . SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/20/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) Modified on 2/21/2018 (cmasec).
February 14, 2018 Filing 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re granting in part and denying in part #54 MOTION to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/14/2018. (slibi, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Affirming and Adopting the July 20, 2017, #49 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Plaintiff's #16 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/10/2017. (cthom, )
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting #57 Unopposed Motion to Stay and Vacate the Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/12/2017. ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending a ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 54) or until further Order of Court. It is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for September 19, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. (slibi, )
September 12, 2017 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM regarding #57 Unopposed MOTION to Stay and Vacate the Scheduling Conference filed by Maggie M. McElderry, Rick Raemisch, Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/12/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 11, 2017 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION to Stay and Vacate the Scheduling Conference by Defendants Genie Connaghan, Maggie M. McElderry, Rick Raemisch. (Alber, Christopher)
August 23, 2017 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Thomas Neilsen. (DeFranco, Ingrid)
August 15, 2017 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM regarding #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maggie M. McElderry, Rick Raemisch, Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/15/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 3, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Genie Connaghan, Maggie M. McElderry, Rick Raemisch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CDOC Inmate Locator)(Alber, Christopher)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER re: discharging #51 Order to Show Cause, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/2017. ORDERED: The Show Cause Hearing scheduled on 9/19/2017 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. Text Only Entry (slibi, )
July 26, 2017 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas Neilsen. Maggie M. McElderry waiver sent on 7/25/2017, answer due 9/25/2017. (DeFranco, Ingrid)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On September 19, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. plaintiff shall appear and provide proof of service for Defendant Maggie M.McElderry, or otherwise show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendant Maggie M. McElderry pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failing to serve this defendant, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/2017. (slibi, ) Modified on 7/26/2017 to discharge pursuant to 53 (slibi, ).
July 25, 2017 Filing 50 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 7/25/2017. Scheduling Conference and Show Cause Hearing set for 9/19/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (slibi, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 49 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan Stone, Thomas Neilsen. The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Against Their ParoleOfficers, the DOC and the Parole Board (Docket No. #16 ) beDENIED, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2017. (jgonz, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Genie Connaghan, Rick Raemisch, Maggie M. McElderly, filed by Thomas Neilsen.(jgonz, )
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #34 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #42 Motion to Stay; granting #45 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to accept Docket No. #45 -1. The Scheduling Conference set for July 25, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. to a Status Conference. Counsel for the parties shall appear in person. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2017. (jgonz, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM regarding #45 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Neilsen. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/20/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 19, 2017 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Thomas Neilsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amended Complaint)(DeFranco, Ingrid)
July 19, 2017 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM regarding #42 Unopposed MOTION to Stay and to Vacate the Scheduling Conference filed by Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/19/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 19, 2017 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Stay and to Vacate the Scheduling Conference by Defendant Genie Connaghan. (Alber, Christopher)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER withdrawing #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction pursuant to #41 Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/18/17. (nmarb, ) Modified on 7/20/2017 to show Motion for Preliminary Injunction withdrawn as to plaintiff's Stone and Upchurch only. (nmarb, ).
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/18/2017. Plaintiffs Stone and Upchurchs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #36 ) is GRANTED. It if further ORDERED that Plaintiff Neilsons Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Docket No. #38 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failing to comply with the duty to confer prescribed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a). (jgonz, )
July 18, 2017 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #38 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Neilsen, #37 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch, #36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with respect to Plaintiffs Stone and Upchurch filed by Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/18/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 17, 2017 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Thomas Neilsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DeFranco, Ingrid)
July 17, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Thomas Neilsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amended Complaint)(DeFranco, Ingrid)
July 14, 2017 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party by Plaintiffs Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch. (Ruttenberg, Alison)
July 14, 2017 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with respect to Plaintiffs Stone and Upchurch by Plaintiffs Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch. (Ruttenberg, Alison)
July 10, 2017 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM regarding #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aaron Amaya, Cook, Rick Raemisch, Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/10/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 26, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Genie Connaghan, Cook, Rick Raemisch. (Alber, Christopher)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Aaron Amaya answer due 6/26/2017; Genie Connaghan answer due 6/26/2017; Cook answer due 6/26/2017; Rick Raemisch answer due 6/26/2017, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/5/2017. (jgonz, )
June 2, 2017 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM regarding #31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Aaron Amaya, Cook, Rick Raemisch, Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/2/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 2, 2017 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Genie Connaghan, Cook, Rick Raemisch. (Alber, Christopher)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Motion to Reset the May 31, 2017 Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/25/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 7/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiffs Jonathan Stone and Dustin Upchurch shall filed their reply brief in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction Docket No. #16 on or before June 2, 2017. (slibi, )
May 25, 2017 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch, #28 Unopposed MOTION to Reset the May 31, 2017 Scheduling Conference filed by Jonathan Stone, Thomas Neilsen, Dustin Upchurch. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/25/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 24, 2017 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Reset the May 31, 2017 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Thomas Neilsen, Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch. (Ruttenberg, Alison)
May 24, 2017 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch. (Ruttenberg, Alison)
May 24, 2017 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Ingrid J. DeFranco added to party Thomas Neilsen(pty:pla) filed by Plaintiffs Thomas Neilsen, Jonathan Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeFranco, Ingrid)
May 10, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Genie Connaghan, Cook, Rick Raemisch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Envelope A-2)(Alber, Christopher)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/04/2017. (slibi, )
May 4, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aaron Amaya, Cook, Rick Raemisch, Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/4/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 3, 2017 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Genie Connaghan, Cook, Rick Raemisch. (Alber, Christopher)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 16) on or before May 5, 2017, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/1/2017. (jgonz, )
April 30, 2017 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Christopher Wayne Alber added to party Aaron Amaya(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Wayne Alber added to party Genie filed by Aaron Amaya, Cook, Rick Raemisch, Genie Connaghan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/30/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 28, 2017 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Christopher Wayne Alber added to party Aaron Amaya(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Wayne Alber added to party Genie Connaghan(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Wayne Alber added to party Cook(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Wayne Alber added to party Rick Raemisch(pty:dft) by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Genie Connaghan, Cook, Rick Raemisch. (Alber, Christopher)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re: #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan Stone, Thomas Neilsen, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2017. Defendants shall file a response on or before May 1, 2017. (slibi, )
April 10, 2017 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan Stone, Thomas Neilsen. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/10/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 10, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Thomas Neilsen, Jonathan Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ruttenberg, Alison) Modified on 7/19/2017 pursuant to #41 Minute Order (tsher, ). Modified on 7/20/2017 to show as withdrawn as to plaintiff's Stone and Upchurch only. Plaintiff Neilson still brings the motion. (nmarb, ).
April 5, 2017 Filing 15 Utility Setting Deadlines: Genie Connaghan waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Cook waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Rick Raemisch waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017 per #14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Text Only Entry (athom, )
April 5, 2017 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dustin Upchurch, Jonathan Stone, Thomas Neilsen. Aaron Amaya waiver sent on 4/5/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Ruttenberg, Alison)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 5/31/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/22/2017. (slibi, )
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Magistrate Judge Watanabe is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 4/30/2017 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED BY Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/22/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 21, 2017 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Order: This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-00617-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/21/17. (dkals, )
March 15, 2017 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. (Text Only Entry) (amenz, )
March 14, 2017 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Minute Order and #5 Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-00617-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER re: #5 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Jonathan Stone, Thomas Neilsen, Dustin Upchurch. This case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/13/2017. (jgonz, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, of Address Correction by Plaintiffs Thomas Neilsen, Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch (DeFranco, Ingrid)
March 9, 2017 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Thomas Neilsen, Jonathan Stone, Dustin Upchurch All parties do not consent.. (Ruttenberg, Alison)
March 9, 2017 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Ingrid J. DeFranco. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (amenz, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (amenz, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (amenz, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5415120)Attorney Alison Lee Ruttenberg added to party Jonathan Stone (pty:pla), Attorney Alison Lee Ruttenberg added to party Dustin Upchurch(pty:pla), filed by Dustin Upchurch, Jonathan Stone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruttenberg, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neilsen v. Connaghan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Neilsen
Represented By: Ingrid J. DeFranco
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Upchurch
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Represented By: Ingrid J. DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Stone
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Represented By: Ingrid J. DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Amaya
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie M. McElderry
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Weant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Odenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missy Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Balazic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bednarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Jemison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mervyn Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelo Kopcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Baydarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Leversee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genie Connaghan
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Lwyer-Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Jenks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Geist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimi Scheuermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?