Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al

Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center, Candelas Glows/Rocky Flats Glows, Rocky Flats Right to Know, Rocky Flats Neighborhood Association and Environmental Network (EIN) Inc.
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Greg Sheehan, Ryan Zinke, David Lucas, United States Federal Highway Administration, Brandye Hendrickson and Elaine Chao
Case Number: 1:2018cv01017
Filed: May 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/05/2018, re: 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record and Consider Extra-Record Evidence is DENIED. (sphil, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction 7 is denied. Plaintiffs' third, fourth, fifth, and sixth claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/9/18. (pabsec)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Federal Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Declarations and Exhibits Submitted in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction 28 is granted in part and denied in part. Federal Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Ce rtain Witnesses from the Preliminary Injuction [sic] Hearing 29 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs shall disclose the substance and general support for Dr. Michael Ketterer's opinions to defendants by Friday, July 13, 2018. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/12/18. (pabsec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candelas Glows/Rocky Flats Glows
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Flats Right to Know
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Flats Neighborhood Association
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Network (EIN) Inc.
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sheehan
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lucas
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandye Hendrickson
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Chao
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?