Maehr v. Internal Revenue Service, et al.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey T. Maehr
Defendant: IRS, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Congress and U.S. State Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv02273
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, U.S. State Department, U.S. Congress, filed by Jeffrey T. Maehr.(agarc, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. #6 ) filed September 19, 2018, is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 30, 2018, to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to file an amended complaint as directed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/21/2018. (angar, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jeffrey T. Maehr. (evana, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Mr. Maehr fails within the time allowed to file an amended complaint that complies with this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/7/2018. (angar, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Plaintiff #3 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/5/2018. (angar, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jeffrey T. Maehr. (dbera, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IRS, filed by Jeffrey T. Maehr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maehr v. Internal Revenue Service, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. State Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T. Maehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?