La Montana Ranch, LLC v. Catch Holdings, LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: La Montana Ranch and La Montana Ranch, LLC
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management, Peggy Brasington, Jeanice W. Green, Foot Creek Corp of Arizona, Catch Holdings, LLC, The, 1537 Paper Street, LLC, Norman J. Slaustas and Mitchell R. Brasington
Case Number: 1:2018cv02413
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service to Eagle County District Court re: #43 Order. (ebuch)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Defendant Bureau of Land Management is dismissed from the case and the case is remanded to Colorado State District Court for Eagle County, By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/13/2018. (ebuch)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REASSIGNMENT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/12/2018. (evana, )
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/12/18. Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and to Vacate the Scheduling/Planning Conference #37 is GRANTED. All scheduling and discovery in this case are hereby STAYED pending the resolution of Defendant BLM's Motion to Dismiss #28 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for December 17, 2018, at 9:30 a.m., and all associated deadlines are VACATED. (lgale, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #37 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and to Vacate the Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by United States Bureau of Land Management. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/11/2018. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/11/2018. (ebuch)
December 11, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Prose, Susan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and to Vacate the Scheduling/Planning Conference by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Prose, Susan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant BLM has up to and including 12/11/2018 to file a reply to #28 MOTION to Dismiss, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/27/2018. (ebuch)
November 26, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff La Montana Ranch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gentile, Adam)
November 19, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant 1537 Paper Street, LLC, Counter Claimant 1537 Paper Street, LLC. (Lasater, Kieran)
November 14, 2018 Filing 33 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #32 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02413-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER re: #29 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by United States Bureau of Land Management. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/2018. (jgonz, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Catch Holdings, LLC, The. (Oliver, Gerald)
November 13, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Foot Creek Corp of Arizona, Jeanice W. Green, Norman J. Slaustas. (Porterfield, Wendell)
November 11, 2018 Filing 29 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management All parties do not consent.. (Prose, Susan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Beck declaration, #2 Exhibit 2, Notice of Dismissal (state case), #3 Exhibit 3, Order reinstating BLM (state case))(Prose, Susan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gerald William Oliver on behalf of Catch Holdings, LLC, TheAttorney Gerald William Oliver added to party Catch Holdings, LLC, The(pty:dft) (Oliver, Gerald)
October 16, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kieran Anthony Lasater on behalf of 1537 Paper Street, LLCAttorney Kieran Anthony Lasater added to party 1537 Paper Street, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kieran Anthony Lasater added to party 1537 Paper Street, LLC(pty:cc) (Lasater, Kieran)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/18. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 9:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam John Gentile on behalf of La Montana Ranch, LLCAttorney Adam John Gentile added to party La Montana Ranch, LLC(pty:pla) (Gentile, Adam)
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Dawes on behalf of La Montana Ranch, LLCAttorney Christopher J. Dawes added to party La Montana Ranch, LLC(pty:pla) (Dawes, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 United States Bureau of Land Management answer due 11/5/2018 pursuant to #22 . (lgale, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/3/18. Unopposed Motion for Order Regarding Response Deadline #21 is GRANTED. Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Quiet Title #3 on or before November 5, 2018. (lgale, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Establish a Response Deadline by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Prose, Susan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr on behalf of Foot Creek Corp of Arizona, Jeanice W. Green, Norman J. SlaustasAttorney Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr added to party Foot Creek Corp of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr added to party Jeanice W. Green(pty:dft), Attorney Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr added to party Norman J. Slaustas(pty:dft) (Porterfield, Wendell)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER of Norman J. Slaustas and Jeanice W. Green to #3 First Amended Complaint, by Jeanice W. Green, Norman J. Slaustas.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER of Defendant Catch Holdings, LLC, The to #3 First Amended Complaint, by Catch Holdings, LLC, The.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER of Defendant Foot Creek Corp of Arizona to #3 First Amended Complaint, by Foot Creek Corp of Arizona.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER and Counterclaim to First Amended Complaint #3 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against La Montana Ranch, LLC by 1537 Paper Street, LLC.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 Plaintiff's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to 1537 Paper Street, LLC's Counterclaim to #14 Answer to Counterclaim by La Montana Ranch, LLC.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER and Counterclaim to #4 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against La Montana Ranch, LLC by 1537 Paper Street, LLC.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER of Norman J. Slaustas and Jeanice W. Green to #4 Complaint, by Jeanice W. Green, Norman J. Slaustas.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER of Defendant Foot Creek Corp of Arizona to #4 Complaint, by Foot Creek Corp of Arizona.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by 1537 Paper Street, LLC.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER of Defendant The Catch Holdings, LLC to #4 Complaint For Declaratory Relief and Quiet Title, by Catch Holdings, LLC, The.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) by Eagle County District Court Judge Frederick W. Gannett on 02/28/2018. (rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint upon United States Bureau of Land Management on 09/04/2018 (rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Quiet Title against 1537 Paper Street, LLC, Mitchell R. Brasington, Peggy Brasington, Catch Holdings, LLC, The, Foot Creek Corp of Arizona, Jeanice W. Green, Norman J. Slaustas, United States Bureau of Land Management, filed by La Montana Ranch, LLC.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 First Amended COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Quiet Title against 1537 Paper Street, LLC, Mitchell R. Brasington, Peggy Brasington, Catch Holdings, LLC, The, Foot Creek Corp of Arizona, Jeanice W. Green, Norman J. Slaustas, United States Bureau of Land Management, filed by La Montana Ranch, LLC.(rroge, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Exhibit 1 by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management (Prose, Susan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Bureau of Land Management from Eagle County DIstrict Court, Case Number 2017CV030247., filed by United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37)(Prose, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Montana Ranch, LLC v. Catch Holdings, LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Montana Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Montana Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Adam John Gentile
Represented By: Christopher J. Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Brasington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanice W. Green
Represented By: Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Creek Corp of Arizona
Represented By: Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catch Holdings, LLC, The
Represented By: Gerald William Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1537 Paper Street, LLC
Represented By: Kieran Anthony Lasater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman J. Slaustas
Represented By: Wendell B. Porterfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell R. Brasington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?