Save the Colorado et al v. Semonite et al

Petitioner: Environmental Group, The, WildEarth Guardians, Save the Colorado, Waterkeeper Alliance, Living Rivers and Sierra Club
Respondent: Margaret Everson, Todd T. Semonite and Ryan Zinke
Intervenor: The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)
Case Number: 1:2018cv03258
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Albert M. Ferlo, Jr on behalf of The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)Attorney Albert M. Ferlo, Jr added to party The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)(pty:intv) (Ferlo, Albert)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER This matter comes before the Court on the Motion of the City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners ("Denver Water") for Leave to Intervene as a Respondent. (ECF No. #7 ). Denver Water seeks to intervene either under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2), as a matter of right, or under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b)(1)(B), permissively. After carefully reviewing Denver Waters motion and the relevant authority, I find that it has satisfied the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2), and the pending motion to Intervene (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. Denver Water is permitted to intervene as a Respondent because it satisfies the requirements for intervention under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Denver Water shall have up to and including April 26, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition for Review of Agency Action (ECF No. #1 ). by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/8/2019. (evana, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER The Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer or otherwise respond (ECF No. #13 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Defendants shall have up to and including April 26, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/8/2019. (evana, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Respondents Margaret Everson, Todd T. Semonite, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Costello, Sara)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Costello on behalf of Margaret Everson, Todd T. Semonite, Ryan ZinkeAttorney Sara Elizabeth Costello added to party Margaret Everson(pty:res), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Costello added to party Todd T. Semonite(pty:res), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Costello added to party Ryan Zinke(pty:res) (Costello, Sara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Jessica R. Brody by Jessica Brody on behalf of The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)Attorney Jessica Brody added to party The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)(pty:mov) (Brody, Jessica)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Daniel J. Arnold by Daniel John Arnold on behalf of The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)Attorney Daniel John Arnold added to party The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)(pty:mov) (Arnold, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donald C. Baur on behalf of The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)Attorney Donald C. Baur added to party The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)(pty:intvd) (Baur, Donald)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of James Lochhead regarding Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and to Extend Time to Answer Petition #7 by Intervenor Defendant The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Oliphant, Bradley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and to Extend Time to Answer Petition Movant The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Oliphant, Bradley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Howard Oliphant on behalf of The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)Attorney Bradley Howard Oliphant added to party The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)(pty:intvd) (Oliphant, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Eubanks, William)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/19/2018. (evana, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION against Margaret Everson, Todd Semonite, Ryan Zinke (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6447021)Attorney William Stewart Eubanks, II added to party Living Rivers(pty:pet), Attorney William Stewart Eubanks, II added to party Save the Colorado(pty:pet), Attorney William Stewart Eubanks, II added to party Sierra Club(pty:pet), Attorney William Stewart Eubanks, II added to party The Environmental Group(pty:pet), Attorney William Stewart Eubanks, II added to party Waterkeeper Alliance(pty:pet), Attorney William Stewart Eubanks, II added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pet), filed by Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians, The Environmental Group, Living Rivers, Save the Colorado, Waterkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Eubanks, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save the Colorado et al v. Semonite et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environmental Group, The
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Save the Colorado
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Waterkeeper Alliance
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Living Rivers
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Everson
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd T. Semonite
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The City and County of Denver, acting by and through its Board of Water Commissioners (Denver Water)
Represented By: Bradley Howard Oliphant
Represented By: Jessica Brody
Represented By: Daniel John Arnold
Represented By: Albert M. Ferlo, Jr.
Represented By: Donald C. Baur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?