Solis v. Stancil et al
Plaintiff: Arturo Solis
Defendant: Carl M. Miedich, Munoz, M. A. Stancil, Kyle, S. Maes, S. Anaya, Vails, C. Goodwin, Vigil, Bolings, J. Butkovich, G. Romain, Weise, Rodriguez and Hawkins
Respondent: Medina
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 bv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Objection and MOTION for Reconsideration by Vested Art III Judge of Magistrate Feb 21, 2019 Order Denying 90-Day Extension to Show Cause and Refusing to order F.B.O.P. Officials to Allow me Access to Law Library, by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, ) #1 Letter) (angar, ). Modified on 3/8/2019 to add attachment (angar, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Waiver of Filing Fees, by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(angar, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Declaration that the Prisoner's Trust Fund Withdrawal Statutes 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(a)(2);(b)(1);(b)(2);(f)(2)(B) are Illegal Unconstitutional and beyond Courts Power to Impose, by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Declaration that Three-Strikes Law in 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's "Motion for Ninety (90) Day Extension of Time in Which to Timely Show Cause" (ECF No. #13 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART only as follows. The Court will grant Plaintiff a thirty-day extension of time. Plaintiff must comply with the Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #6 ). Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Direct by Court Order for F.B.O.P. Defendants to Allow Me Adequate Use of the Prisoner Law Library and/or Provide Legal Research Material (ECF No. #12 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/21/2019. (angar, ) #6 sent to Plaintiff
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION for Ninety (90) Days Extension of Time in which to Timely Show Cause as Ordered Jan 24, 2019 ECF #6 and #5 by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Court to Direct by Court Order for F.B.O.P. Defendants to Allow me to Adequate use the Prison Law Library and/or Provide Legal Research, by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, )
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The "Motion for Ninety (90) Day Extension of Time in Which to Timely Add New Claims (ECF No. #9 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. The Court reminds Plaintiff of his outstanding obligation under the Order to Show Cause, entered January 24, 2019 (ECF No. #6 ). The "Motion to Invoke Courts Equity Powers, Common Law Causes and Criminal Prosecutions Under 18 U.S.C. 241 and 242, in this Bivens Action (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/15/2019. (angar, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Invoke Courts Equity Powers Common Law Causes and Criminal Prosecutions under 18 U.S.C. 241 and 242 by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Ninety (90) Day Extension of Time in which to Timely add New Claims, by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(angar, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Letter re: STATEMENTS by Plaintiff Arturo Solis. (angar, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Jury Trial Demand, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (angar, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Show Cause. If Plaintiff fails to show cause within the time allowed, he will be denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis. "Plaintiff's Motion for Ninety (90) day Extension of Time in which to Timely File Six Month Trust Fund Account Statement" (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED IN PART as follows. Plaintiff must file a copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/24/2019. (angar, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Ninety (90) day Extension of Time in which to Timely file Sic Month Trust Fund Account Statement, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (angar, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (angar, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/10/2019. (angar, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Arturo Solis. (Attachments: #1 Order Severing Case from 18-cv-2842-GPG)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Stancil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl M. Miedich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. A. Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Maes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Anaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Butkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?