Warner Records Inc et al v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Universal Music Publishing Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Arista Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Roadrunner Records, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, INc., Bad Boy Records LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., WB Music Corp., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Universal Music Corp, Rightsong Music Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., LaFace Records LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Nonsuch Records Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI April Music Inc., WEA International Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Island Music Limited, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. doing business as EMI Foray Music, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. doing business as EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music, Universal/Island Music Limited, Maverick Recording Company, W Chappell Music Corp. doing business as WC Music Corp, Music Corporation of America Inc. and Musik Edition Discoton GMBH
Respondent: MarkMonitor, Inc., Jill Lesser, Recording Industry Association of America, The and Audible Magic Corp.
Counter Claimant: Stone Diamond Music Corp., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Algee Music Corp., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., Provident Label Group, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Charter Communications, Inc., Warner Records Inc, Lava Records LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Century Family, Inc., Universal/MCA Music Limited and Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited
Counter Defendant: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Universal Music Publishing AB, EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Arista Records LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, EMI U Catalog Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Stone Agate Music, Nonesuch Records, Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, W.C.M. Music Corp., All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Famous Music LLC and W Chappell Music Corp.
Amicus Curiae: Amici Curiae Copyright Law Professors
Intervenor: Cox Communications, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: BCS Computers LLC
Special Master: Regina M. Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00874
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
2 Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 765 MEMORANDUM regarding #764 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #764 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/22/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities regarding Motions to Exclude by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 762 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Notice of Supplemental Authority to 565 MOTION to Exclude by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 6/7/2022 to edit event type and linkage per chambers. (sphil, ).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 761 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 June 2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #756 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction Defendant's first and second-filed Notices of Supplemental Evidence (ECF #747 & #748 ) as well as Exhibit 1 attached to both (ECF 747-1 and 748-1). Defendant provides redacted versions of the Notices at ECF 756-1 & 756-2.(cmadr, )
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 760 DUPLICATE ENTRY - ORDER granting #758 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs of Stacey K. Grigsby. Attorney Stacey Kamya Grigsby is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/1/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) Modified on 6/1/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER granting #758 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs of Stacey K. Grigsby. Attorney Stacey Kamya Grigsby is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/1/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 758 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs of Stacey K. Grigsby by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sahni, Neema)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 757 MEMORANDUM regarding #756 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #756 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/25/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 756 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 755 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Notice of Withdrawal and Resubmission by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Anderson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C)(Brewer, Linda) Modified on 6/2/2022 to add document title. (sphil, ).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 754 MINUTE ORDER re: #751 Notice and #752 Response. To Charter: fix it. To plaintiffs: No declaration. It is unnecessary and just piles more paper on an already beleaguered court. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/19/2022. (rbjsec. )
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, ECF No. 594 (filed as a restricted document as ECF No. #592 ) is DENIED; 2. Charter's Motion for Curative Measures and Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence, ECF No. 595 (filed as a restricted document as ECF No. #593 ) is DENIED; 3. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Dan Vasey, ECF No. 689 (filed as a restricted document as ECF No. #681 ) is DENIED; 4. Charter's Motion for Discovery Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 37(c), ECF No. 691 (filed as a restricted document at ECF No. #686 ) is DENIED; 5. Charter's Motion for Contempt and Discovery Sanctions Against MarkMonitor, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 45(g), ECF No. 692 (filed as a restrict document at ECF No. #687 ) is DENIED; 6. The magistrate judge's initial recommendation on the spoliation motions, ECF No. #718 , is MOOT, as it has been amended; and 7. The magistrate judge's amended recommendation, ECF No. #735 , is accepted and adopted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/18/2022.(rbjsec. )
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 752 RESPONSE to #751 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 751 NOTICE re #749 Order on Motion to Strike, Charter's Notice in Response to the Court's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Brewer, Linda)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 750 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Charter's Response to #748 Plaintiffs'Re-Filed Notice of Supplemental Evidence for 564 Motions for Summary Judgment by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 5/13/2022 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 624 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 663 Motion to Strike by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/12/22.(jdyne, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 748 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Plaintiffs'Re-Filed Notice of Supplemental Evidence for 564 Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 5/13/2022 to add document title. (sphil, ).
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 747 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Evidence for 564 Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 5/11/2022 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MINUTE ORDER: The parties have filed 12 Rule 702/Daubert motions: 563 (547); 565 (550); 566 (551); * 567 (552); * 568 (553); * 569 (554); * 571 (556); * 572 (557); * 573 (558); 574 (559); * 575 (560); 576 (561). The numbers in parentheses are the restricted versions. The numbers that have an * state in the caption that a Daubert hearing is requested (these were filed by the defendant). The Court requests that counsel file a Joint Status Report by 5/6/2022 to notify Chambers as to which of these motions, if any, the parties actually request an evidentiary hearing; and which, if any, they are willing to have the Court address on the papers. If evidentiary hearings are requested, then the Court will hold the hearings during one of the following blocks: May 11-12, 2022; May 19-20, 2022; or June 13-14, 2022. The Court will allocate the time according to the number of hearings requested. The Court requests that counsel confer and then notified Chambers promptly at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov of which date block you select. If the parties are unable to agree on the date, the Court will choose. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/2/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 738 OBJECTION to #735 Amended Report and Recommendations filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #737 filed on 4/7/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 737 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re: #686 Restricted Document - Level 1,, #558 Restricted Document - Level 1, #560 Restricted Document - Level 1, #555 Restricted Document - Level 1, #712 Restricted Document - Level 1, by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., et al (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 4/4/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 735 AMENDED RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONCERNING THE PARTIES RESPSECTIVE SPOLIATION MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 March 2022. I respectfully recommend Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions [592/594] and Charter's Motion for Curative Measures and Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence [593/595] be granted in part and denied in part as discussed herein. (cmadr, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #725 Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify. An Amended Recommendation will be docketed separately. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/24/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 733 RESPONSE to #725 MOTION to Clarify re #718 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 594 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Blacks U.S.A., INC., 595 MOTION for Order to filed by Charter Communications, Inc. filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 732 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 March 2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #723 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction Plaintiffs' Consolidated Reply (ECF #708 ). Defendant provides redacted version of the filing at ECF 723-1. (cmadr, )
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 742 REPLY to Response to 691 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #729 filed on 3/14/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 741 REPLY to Response to 692 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #731 filed on 3/14/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 731 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #3 Exhibit BB, #4 Exhibit CC, #5 Exhibit DD, #6 Exhibit EE, #7 Exhibit FF)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #727 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to Magistrate Judge's Recommendation on Spoliation and to Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of Recommendation. The Court will allow both parties 14 days after the magistrate judge issues a ruling on the motion for clarification to file objections, if they still have objections. However, having reviewed the recommendation, the court requires that any objection be filed on or before the 14th day, and that the objections be strictly limited to five pages per side, measured from the top of the caption to the bottom of the certificate of service with double spacing and margins as required by the rules. The Court does not wish to receive responses or replies to the objections. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/14/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 729 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #3 Exhibit EE, #4 Exhibit FF, #5 Exhibit GG, #6 Exhibit HH, #7 Exhibit II)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 728 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 14 March 2022. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #720 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction Defendant's Response (ECF #702 ) to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Dan Vasey and the Declaration of Jason D. Moore (ECF 702-3). Defendant provides redacted versions of those two filings at ECF 720-1 and ECF 720-2.(cmadr, )
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 727 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to Magistrate Judge's Recommendation on Spoliation and to Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of Recommendation by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 726 MEMORANDUM regarding #725 MOTION to Clarify re #718 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Motion #725 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/10/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 725 MOTION to Clarify re #718 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 594 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Blacks U.S.A., INC., 595 MOTION for Order to filed by Charter Communications, Inc. by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 724 MEMORANDUM regarding #723 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #723 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/9/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER that prior to seeking any relief from the Court in any form, the parties are directed to engage in the conferral process required by Local Rule 7.1(a) except as to matters specifically excluded by that Rule. The parties are further directed that outside the matters covered by Judge Hegartys practice standards concerning discovery disputes, any request for relief from the Court must be sought by motion after such conferral. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/08/2022. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, )
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 721 MEMORANDUM regarding #720 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Motion #720 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/7/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Response to 689 MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #719 filed on 3/4/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 720 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 719 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 718 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 March 2022. For these reasons, I respectfully recommend Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions [592/594] and Charter's Motion for Curative Measures and Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence [593/595] be granted in part and denied in part as discussed herein (cmadr, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 717 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 March 2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #709 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike filed at ECF #693 . Defendant provides a redacted version of its Response at ECF 709-1.(cmadr, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 March 2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict Certain Exhibits #699 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the filings at ECF 686-25, 686-26, 687-22, and 687-23.(cmadr, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 745 Opposition to 692 Charter Communication, Inc.'s MOTION for Sanctions filed by Respondent MarkMonitor, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #713 filed on 2/25/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to 691 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document [712 ] filed on 2/25/2022 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 715 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1:Declaration of Andrew Castricone in by Respondent MarkMonitor, Inc... (Engle, Hannah) Modified on to add document title. 5/2/2022 (sphil, ).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 714 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Declaration of Tyge Felby to 745 Opposition to 692 Charter Communication, Inc.'s MOTION for Sanctions by Respondent MarkMonitor, Inc... (Engle, Hannah) Modified to add document title and linkage. 5/2/2022 (sphil, ).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 713 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Respondent MarkMonitor, Inc... (Engle, Hannah)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 712 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 711 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah Elouise Engle on behalf of MarkMonitor, Inc.Attorney Hannah Elouise Engle added to party MarkMonitor, Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Hannah Elouise Engle added to party MarkMonitor, Inc.(pty:res) (Engle, Hannah)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 710 MEMORANDUM regarding #709 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #709 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/24/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 740 REPLY to Response to [663, 654] MOTIONS to Strike #650 Restricted Document - Level 1 filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #708 filed on 2/23/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 709 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 708 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Sperling, Jonathan)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on February 22, 2022. For good cause shown, the Joint Motion to File a Single Memorandum in Support of Restriction filed February 18, 2022; ECF #701 is granted. The parties and interested non-party MarkMonitor, Inc. may file a consolidated motion on March 25, 2022 to restrict access to the Rule 37(c) Motions at ECF 687 & 686 and their respective briefing. The subject filings shall be maintained under a Level 1 restriction until the consolidated motion is decided by the Court.(alave, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 706 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/22/2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Maintain Certain Filings Under Restriction filed February 11, 2022; ECF #697 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction ECF 632 and its exhibits and ECF 682 and its exhibits. Redacted versions of the above filings are attached to ECF 697.(alave, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/22/2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendants Motion to Maintain Certain Filings Under Restriction filed February 11, 2022; ECF #696 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the following ECF filings: 632, 632-7, 632-17; 633 and its attached exhibits (excluding ECF 633-23, ECF 633-27, ECF 633-92, ECF 633-98); 680 and its attached exhibits; and 681. Redacted versions of the above filings are attached to ECF 696. This Motion also requests restricting access to ECF 682, but the Court addresses that request in its Minute Order on the contemporaneously filed Motion at ECF 697.(alave, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 704 MEMORANDUM regarding #701 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Restrict in Connection with Rule 37(c) Briefing. Motion #701 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/22/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Charter's Opposition/RESPONSE to 689 MOTION to Strike portions of the Declaration of Dan Vasey filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document [#702] filed on 2/18/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 2/22/2022 to add text. (sphil, ).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 702 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason D. Moore, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Rosenthal, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Restrict in Connection with Rule 37(c) Briefing by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., et al (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 2/22/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MEMORANDUM regarding #699 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #699 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/18/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 698 MEMORANDUM regarding #696 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. #697 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. Motions #696 and #697 are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/14/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/22/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit II, #4 Exhibit III, #5 Exhibit IV, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibit VI, #8 Exhibit VII, #9 Exhibit VIII, #10 Exhibit IX, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit XI, #13 Exhibit XII, #14 Exhibit XIII, #15 Exhibit XIV, #16 Exhibit XV, #17 Exhibit XVI, #18 Exhibit XVII)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10 February 2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Maintain Certain Filings Under Restriction #684 is granted.(cmadr, )
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 695 RESPONSE to 663 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #693 filed on 2/9/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 5/2/2022 to edit linkage. (sphil, ).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 693 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MOTION for Contempt and Discovery Sanctions Against Markmonitor, Inc Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(c) and 45(g), by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #687 filed on 2/4/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 2/8/2022 to add text. (sphil, ).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MOTION for Discovery Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(c), by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #686 filed on 2/4/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 687 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 686 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 685 MEMORANDUM regarding #684 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #684 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/3/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit II, #4 Exhibit III, #5 Exhibit IV, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibit VI, #8 Exhibit VII, #9 Exhibit VIII, #10 Exhibit IX, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit XI, #13 Exhibit XII, #14 Exhibit XIII, #15 Exhibit XIV, #16 Exhibit XV, #17 Exhibit XVI, #18 Exhibit XVII, #19 Exhibit XVIII, #20 Exhibit XIX, #21 Exhibit XX, #22 Exhibit XXI, #23 Exhibit XXII, #24 Exhibit XXIII, #25 Exhibit XXIV, #26 Exhibit XXV, #27 Exhibit XXVI, #28 Exhibit XXVII, #29 Exhibit XXVIII, #30 Exhibit XXIX, #31 Exhibit XXX, #32 Exhibit XXXI, #33 Exhibit XXXII, #34 Exhibit XXXIII, #35 Exhibit XXXIV, #36 Exhibit XXXV, #37 Exhibit XXXVI, #38 Exhibit XXXVII, #39 Exhibit XXXVIII, #40 Exhibit XXXIX, #41 Exhibit XL, #42 Exhibit XLI, #43 Exhibit XLII, #44 Exhibit XLII, #45 Exhibit XLIV, #46 Exhibit XLV, #47 Exhibit XLVI, #48 Exhibit XLVII, #49 Exhibit XLVIII, #50 Exhibit XLIX, #51 Exhibit L, #52 Exhibit LI, #53 Exhibit LII, #54 Exhibit LIII, #55 Exhibit LIV, #56 Exhibit LV, #57 Exhibit LVI, #58 Exhibit LVII)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 January 2022. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #660 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the following filings: Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Mary Haynes and Andrew Schapiro (ECF #608 ) and its Exhibit 1 (ECF 608-2); Defendant's Response thereto (ECF #634 ); and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opposition Declarations of Mary Haynes, Andrew Schapiro, and Duncan Hall (ECF #654 ) and its Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 (ECF 654-2, 654-3, and 654-4) until further order of the Court. Redacted versions of the above filings are attached to ECF 660.(cmadr, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 690 REPLY in Support to 595 Charter's MOTION for Curative Measures and Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #682 filed on 1/28/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Dan Vasey by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #681 filed on 1/28/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 688 REPLY to Response to 594 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #680 filed on 1/28/2022). (sphil, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 682 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #3 Exhibit X, #4 Exhibit Y)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 681 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 2/8/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 680 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs' All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 2/8/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER granting #678 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael L. Brody is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/28/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 678 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Counter Defendant Charter Communications, Inc., Counter Claimant Charter Communications, Inc., Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Brody, Michael)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MEMORANDUM regarding #660 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Motion #660 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/25/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MINUTE ORDER re: #657 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE CORRECTED DECLARATION - Restricted Document - Level 1 filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Grant in part. The Clerk's office cannot substitute a document, but the Court accepts the corrected declaration at ECF No. 657-1 and will refer to it, not the unsigned version. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/25/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 660 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV, #5 Exhibit V)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 January 2022. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to File Consolidated Motions in Support of Maintaining Filings Under Restriction #639 is granted. The parties are given leave to file their respective consolidated motions on February 11, 2022 to restrict the January 7, 2022 and January 28, 2022 filings. Those filings shall be maintained under a Level 1 restriction until the consolidated motions are decided by the Court.(cmadr, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER granting #656 MOTION for Leave to File (EXPEDITED) a Single, Consolidated Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike (ECF 608 and 654). By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/21/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 657 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 656 MOTION for Leave to File (EXPEDITED) a Single, Consolidated Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike (ECF 608 and 654) #608 Restricted Document - Level 1,,,,,,, #654 Restricted Document - Level 1, by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 677 REPLY to Response to 570 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #655 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 676 REPLY to Response to 575 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #653 filed on 1/19/2022 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 675 REPLY to Response to 576 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #652 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 674 REPLY to Response to 563 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #651 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 673 REPLY to Response to 564 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #650 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 672 REPLY to Response to 571 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #649 filed on 1/19/2022 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 671 REPLY to Response to 569 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #648 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 670 REPLY to Response to 568 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #647 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 669 REPLY to Response to 567 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #646 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 668 REPLY to Response to 566 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #645 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 667 REPLY to Response to 565 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #644 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 666 REPLY to Response to 574 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #643 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 665 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Response to 573 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #642 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 664 REPLY to Response to 572 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #641 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MOTION to Strike #650 Restricted Document - Level 1 by Plaintiff Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #654 filed on 1/19/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 655 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 44, #15 Exhibit 45)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 654 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 653 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, et al. (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 652 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, et al. (Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 651 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, et al. (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 650 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary Haynes, #2 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #3 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 649 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 648 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 647 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Anten, Todd)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 646 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Anten, Todd)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 645 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 644 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Anten, Todd)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 643 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Oppenheim, #2 Exhibit 6)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 642 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14)(Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 641 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 7)(Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 640 MEMORANDUM regarding #639 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict. Motion #639 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/19/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 639 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, et al (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive to [633, 635] OPPOSITION to 594 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-2. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 637 RESPONSE to 624 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #634 filed on 1/10/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 634 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Rose, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 636 Plaintiffs' OPPOSITION to 595 MOTION for Order to filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #632 filed on 1/7/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 635 OPPOSITION to 594 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #633 filed on 1/7/2022). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 1/14/2022 to edit file date. (sphil, ).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 633 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits Index, #2 Declaration of Kirill Abramov, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Declaration of Laurie Rowlett, #20 Exhibit 1, #21 Exhibit 2, #22 Declaration of Dan Vasey, #23 Exhibit 1, #24 Exhibit 2, #25 Exhibit 3, #26 Exhibit 4, #27 Exhibit 5, #28 Exhibit 6, #29 Exhibit 7, #30 Exhibit 8, #31 Exhibit 9, #32 Exhibit 10, #33 Exhibit 11, #34 Exhibit 12, #35 Exhibit 13, #36 Exhibit 14, #37 Exhibit 15, #38 Exhibit 16, #39 Exhibit 17, #40 Exhibit 18, #41 Exhibit 19, #42 Exhibit 20, #43 Exhibit 21, #44 Exhibit 22, #45 Exhibit 23, #46 Exhibit 24, #47 Exhibit 25, #48 Exhibit 26, #49 Exhibit 27, #50 Exhibit 28, #51 Exhibit 29, #52 Exhibit 30, #53 Exhibit 31, #54 Exhibit 32, #55 Exhibit 33, #56 Exhibit 34, #57 Exhibit 35, #58 Exhibit 36, #59 Exhibit 37, #60 Exhibit 38, #61 Exhibit 39, #62 Exhibit 40, #63 Exhibit 41, #64 Exhibit 42, #65 Exhibit 43, #66 Exhibit 44, #67 Exhibit 45, #68 Exhibit 46, #69 Exhibit 47, #70 Exhibit 48, #71 Exhibit 49, #72 Exhibit 50, #73 Declaration of Colton Mabb, #74 Exhibit 1, #75 Exhibit 2, #76 Exhibit 3, #77 Exhibit 4, #78 Exhibit 5, #79 Declaration of Jason D. Moore, #80 Exhibit 1, #81 Exhibit 2, #82 Exhibit 3, #83 Exhibit 4, #84 Exhibit 5, #85 Exhibit 6, #86 Exhibit 7, #87 Exhibit 8, #88 Exhibit 9, #89 Exhibit 10, #90 Exhibit 11, #91 Exhibit 12, #92 Exhibit 13, #93 Exhibit 14, #94 Exhibit 15, #95 Exhibit 16, #96 Exhibit 17, #97 Exhibit 18, #98 Exhibit 19, #99 Exhibit 20, #100 Exhibit 21, #101 Exhibit 22, #102 Exhibit 23, #103 Exhibit 24)(Rosenthal, John)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 632 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Declaration of S. Marks, #14 Declaration of A. McMullan, #15 Declaration of W. Leak, #16 Declaration of B. Cohen, #17 Declaration of S. Bahun, #18 Declaration of S. Paszkowski)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER granting #615 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Restrict. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/3/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 616 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/28/2021. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict [filed December 17, 2021; ECF #597 ] is granted. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Restrict [filed December 17, 2021; ECF #598 ] also is granted. (agarc, )
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sahni, Neema)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 623 RESPONSE to 573 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #607 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Plaintiffs' Opposition to 569 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #606 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Plaintiffs' Opposition to 566 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC., et al (Public Entry for Restricted Document #605 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 620 RESPONSE to 572 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #604 filed on 12/20/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 619 RESPONSE to 563 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #602 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 618 RESPONSE to 570 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #601 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Plaintiffs' Opposition to 567 Charter's MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #600 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 614 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #3 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #4 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #5 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #6 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 5, #7 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 6, #8 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 7, #9 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 8, #10 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 9, #11 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 10, #12 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 11, #13 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 12, #14 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 13, #15 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 14, #16 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 15, #17 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 16, #18 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 17, #19 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 18, #20 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 19, #21 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 20, #22 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 21, #23 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 22, #24 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 23, #25 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 24, #26 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 25, #27 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 26, #28 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 27, #29 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 28, #30 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 29, #31 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 30, #32 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 31, #33 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 32, #34 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 33, #35 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 34, #36 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 35, #37 Declaration of K. Buchan, #38 Buchan Decl. Exhibit 1, #39 Declaration of H. Furchtgott-Roth, #40 Furchtgott-Roth Decl. Exhibit 1)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 613 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Gould, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 612 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Doak, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 611 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 610 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Gould, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 609 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Anten, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 608 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Sahni, Neema)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 607 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Reed, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 606 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 605 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 604 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justine Young, #2 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 603 RESPONSE to 568 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Paul Geluso and the "Listeners" filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Geluso, #2 Declaration of Phil Hill, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Sperling, Jonathan)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 602 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Scher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 601 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A to Schapiro Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Schapiro Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Schapiro Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Schapiro Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Schapiro Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Schapiro Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Schapiro Declaration, #9 Exhibit H-1 to Schapiro Declaration, #10 Exhibit H-2 to Schapiro Declaration, #11 Exhibit H-3 to Schapiro Declaration, #12 Exhibit H-4 to Schapiro Declaration, #13 Declaration of Mary Haynes, #14 Exhibit A to Haynes Declaration, #15 Exhibit B to Haynes Declaration, #16 Exhibit C to Haynes Declaration, #17 Exhibit D to Haynes Declaration, #18 Declaration of Karl Snow, #19 Affidavit of Duncan Hall, #20 Exhibit A to Hall Affidavit)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 600 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Grigsby, Stacey)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 599 MEMORANDUM regarding #597 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict and #598 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. Motions #597 and #598 are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/20/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Respondent Recording Industry Association of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gould, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 596 MEMORANDUM regarding 594 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Blacks U.S.A., INC., 595 MOTION for Order to filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Motions 594 and 595 are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/7/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 595 Charter's MOTION for Curative Measures and Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #593 filed on 12/3/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #592 filed on 12/3/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 593 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 592 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corey Miller, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 12/7/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting #590 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/30/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Joint MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit II, #4 Exhibit III, #5 Exhibit IV, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibit VI, #8 Exhibit VII, #9 Exhibit VIII, #10 Exhibit IX, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit XI, #13 Exhibit XII, #14 Exhibit XIII, #15 Exhibit XIV, #16 Exhibit XV, #17 Exhibit XVI, #18 Exhibit XVII, #19 Exhibit XVIII, #20 Exhibit XIX, #21 Exhibit XX, #22 Exhibit XXI, #23 Exhibit XXII, #24 Exhibit XXIII, #25 Exhibit XXIV, #26 Exhibit XXV, #27 Exhibit XXVI, #28 Exhibit XXVII, #29 Exhibit XXVIII, #30 Exhibit XXIX, #31 Exhibit XXX, #32 Exhibit XXXI, #33 Exhibit XXXII, #34 Exhibit XXXIII, #35 Exhibit XXXIV, #36 Exhibit XXXV, #37 Exhibit XXXVI, #38 Exhibit XXXVII, #39 Exhibit XXXVIII, #40 Exhibit XXXIX, #41 Exhibit XL)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 29 November 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule #584 is granted. The deadline for Plaintiffs and Defendant to file motions seeking sanctions regarding alleged failures to retain certain documents and information is December 3, 2021. The deadline for filing responses is January 7, 2022, and the deadline for filing replies is January 28, 2022.(cmadr, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting #585 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/29/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MEMORANDUM regarding #584 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule. Motion #584 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/29/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 589 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 11/23/2021. (cthom, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/23/2021 to edit document title. (sphil, ).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #544 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Restrict. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER denying #540 / 543 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Disclosures. However, the Court authorizes plaintiffs taking an additional deposition of Mr. Strong, limited to questions concerning the materials produced on October 14, 2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting #526 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 490 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, 44 Scheduling Order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2021.(rbjsec.)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER denying #522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 63 Protective Order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER denying #521 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Cox Communications, Inc. Discovery issues in Sony Music Entertainment v. Cox Communications, Inc., No. 1:18-cv-00950-LO-JFA (E.D.Va.) should be addressed by the presiding judge or magistrate judge in that case. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 578 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Plaintiff's Notice of Corrected Filing to [555-569] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2A, #2 Exhibit 2B)(Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/30/2021 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Hard Drive to 570 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Restricted Document - Level 1 #555 . Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-2. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MOTION to Exclude or limit expert testimony Wayne Coleman. by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC.., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document [561 ] filed on 11/15/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MOTION to Exclude or Limit expert testimony of Dr. Karl Snow by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC.., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document [560 ] filed on 11/15/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MOTION to Exclude or Limit certain expert opinions and testimony Dr. Aram Sinnreich by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC.., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #559 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MOTION to Exclude or Limit certain expert opinions and testimony Dr. Sandeep Chatterjee by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #558 filed on 11/15/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MOTION to Exclude or Limit certain expert opinions and testimony Dr. Kevin C. Almeroth by Plaintiff Bad Boy Records LLC. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #557 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 571 MOTION to Exclude the opinions and testimony Barbara Frederiksen-Cross by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #556 filed on 11/15/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 570 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC.., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #555 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MOTION to Exclude the opinions and testimony Terrence P. McGarty by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #554 filed on 11/15/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MOTION to Exclude opinions and testimony Paul Geluso and the "Listeners" by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #553 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MOTION to Exclude the opinions and testimony Harold Furchtgott-Roth by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #552 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 566 MOTION to Exclude the opinions and testimony Kristofer Buchan by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #551 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 565 MOTION to Exclude the opinions and testimony of Plaintiffs putative expert, On Amir by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #550 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #549 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 563 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of George Strong by Plaintiff All Blacks U.S.A., INC.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #547 filed on 11/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 561 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Sperling, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sperling, Jonathan)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 560 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Gould, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 559 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 558 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Gould, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 557 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 556 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 555 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kaplan Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Kaplan Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Kaplan Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Kaplan Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Kaplan Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Kaplan Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Kaplan Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Kaplan Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Kaplan Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to Kaplan Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 to Kaplan Decl., #13 Exhibit 12 to Kaplan Decl., #14 Exhibit 13 to Kaplan Decl., #15 Exhibit 14 to Kaplan Decl., #16 Exhibit 15 to Kaplan Decl., #17 Exhibit 16 to Kaplan Decl., #18 Exhibit 17 to Kaplan Decl., #19 Exhibit 18 to Kaplan Decl., #20 Exhibit 19 to Kaplan Decl., #21 Exhibit 20 to Kaplan Decl., #22 Exhibit 21 to Kaplan Decl., #23 Exhibit 22 to Kaplan Decl., #24 Exhibit 23 to Kaplan Decl., #25 Exhibit 24 to Kaplan Decl., #26 Exhibit 25 to Kaplan Decl., #27 Exhibit 26 to Kaplan Decl., #28 Exhibit 27 to Kaplan Decl., #29 Exhibit 28 to Kaplan Decl., #30 Exhibit 29 to Kaplan Decl., #31 Exhibit 30 to Kaplan Decl., #32 Exhibit 31 to Kaplan Decl., #33 Declaration of J. Blietz, #34 Declaration of D. Kokakis, #35 Declaration of W. Leak, #36 Declaration of A. McMullan, #37 Declaration of T. Parry, #38 Declaration of A. Patel, #39 Declaration of P. Geluso, #40 Exhibit A to Geluso Decl., #41 Exhibit B to Geluso Decl., #42 Declaration of C. Burst, #43 Exhibit A to Burst Decl., #44 Exhibit B to Burst Decl., #45 Declaration of A. Cass, #46 Exhibit A to Cass Decl., #47 Exhibit B to Cass Decl., #48 Declaration of J. Cheriff, #49 Exhibit A to Cheriff Decl., #50 Exhibit B to Cheriff Decl., #51 Declaration of K. Gilchrest, #52 Exhibit A to Gilchrest Decl., #53 Exhibit B to Gilchrest Decl., #54 Declaration of E. Maltas, #55 Exhibit A to Maltas Decl., #56 Exhibit B to Maltas Decl., #57 Declaration of Y. Lai-Tremewan, #58 Exhibit A to Lai-Tremewan Decl., #59 Exhibit B to Lai-Tremewan Decl., #60 Declaration of R. Wineman, #61 Exhibit A to Wineman Decl., #62 Exhibit B to Wineman Decl., #63 Declaration of S. Bahun, #64 Declaration of B. Frederiksen-Cross, #65 Exhibit 1 to Frederiksen-Cross Decl., #66 Declaration of K. Buchan, #67 Exhibit 1 to Buchan Decl., #68 Exhibit 2A to Buchan Decl., #69 Exhibit 2B to Buchan Decl., #70 Letter from J. Sperling)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 554 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace Chang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 553 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Scher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Anten, Todd)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 552 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Anten, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Anten, Todd)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 551 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Rose, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 550 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katy Akopjan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Anten, Todd)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 549 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary Haynes, #2 Exhibit A to Haynes Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Haynes Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Haynes Declaration, #5 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 548 BRIEF (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Sahni, Neema) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 547 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Grigsby, Stacey) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Opposition to 543 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #546 filed on 11/9/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 546 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Scher, #2 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 545 BRIEF in Opposition to 543 MOTION to Strike (Redacted Version) filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Scher, #2 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 542 REPLY to Response to #522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order filed by Intervenor Cox Communications, Inc.. (Echtman, Elyse)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 541 REPLY to Response to #521 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Cox Communications, Inc.. (Echtman, Elyse)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Disclosures by Plaintiff Arista Records LLC., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #540 filed on 10/25/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 540 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Grigsby, Stacey)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER granting #536 Motion for Leave to Restrict #536 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. The Court requests that the Clerk of Court make the redacted version of the motion at ECF No. 535 available for public view. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/22/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 538 RESPONSE in Opposition to #522 MOTION to Modify #63 Protective Order, and #521 MOTION to Intervene, by Plaintiff's (evana, )(Public Entry for #537 Restricted Document, filed 10/19/2021) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Modified on 10/20/2021 edited to add Text Only Entry)(evana, ).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 537 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., et al.. (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 11/2/2021 to edit parties. (sphil, ).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 535 BRIEF in Opposition to #522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order , #521 MOTION to Intervene filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER denying #533 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Single Brief in Response to Motions Filed By Non-Party Cox Communications, Inc. Plaintiffs should not need more than 15 pages, indeed, should not need 15 pages, to explain why they oppose a third party's desire to intervene in this case. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/18/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Single Brief in Response to Motions Filed By Non-Party Cox Communications, Inc. by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 532 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ERRATA re #530 Supplement/Amendment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 530 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, et al and Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez. (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/2/2021 to edit parties. (sphil, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 529 RESPONSE to #522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order , #521 MOTION to Intervene filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENSE by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 527 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2021. Expert Discovery due 10/15/2021 by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/29/21. (jdyne, )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #490 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, #44 Scheduling Order by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #523 Motion for extension of time to respond to #522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order, #521 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Oppose Non-Party Cox Communications, Inc.'s Motions to Intervene and Modify Protective Order. The Court invites defendant to file a response if they wish to do so as well. Responses due by 10/19/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/24/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 524 RESPONSE to #523 MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by Intervenor Cox Communications, Inc.. (Echtman, Elyse)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Motion for extension of time to respond to #522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order , #521 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Oppose Non-Party Cox Communications, Inc.'s Motions to Intervene and Modify Protective Order by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., et al (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 9/24/2021 to correct event type. (sphil, ).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order by Intervenor Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Elyse D. Echtman in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #21 Exhibit A)(Echtman, Elyse)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 521 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Elyse D. Echtman in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #21 Exhibit A)(Echtman, Elyse)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 520 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on July 28, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-146. Redaction of #509 Transcript,,,. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 519 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on July 15, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-225. Redaction of #508 Transcript,,,. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, the parties' respective Motions to Redact Transcripts #513 & #514 are granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the filings at ECF #508 and ECF #509 until further order of the Court. The parties shall file onto the public docket redacted versions of the subject transcripts by September 10, 2021.(cmadr, )
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 517 CERTIFICATE re: #514 MOTION to Redact #509 Transcript,,, by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Linderot, Anders)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 516 CERTIFICATE Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) re: #513 MOTION to Redact #509 Transcript,,, #508 Transcript,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 515 MEMORANDUM regarding #513 MOTION to Redact #509 Transcript, #508 Transcript and #514 MOTION to Redact #509 Transcript. Motions #513 and #514 are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/31/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MOTION to Redact #509 Transcript,,, by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Linderot, Anders)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION to Redact #509 Transcript,,, #508 Transcript,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Evans Shafroth on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Arista Music(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Arista Music(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Jemaxal Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Jemaxal Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Miller Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Miller Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Mills Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Mills Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI U Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI U Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Unart Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party EMI Unart Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Famous Music LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Famous Music LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Fueled By Ramen LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Fueled By Ramen LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Intersong U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Intersong U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Jobete Music Co. Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Jobete Music Co. Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party LaFace Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party LaFace Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Lava Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Lava Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Maverick Recording Company(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Maverick Recording Company(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Music Corporation of America Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Music Corporation of America Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Musik Edition Discoton GMBH(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Musik Edition Discoton GMBH(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Nonesuch Records, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Nonesuch Records, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party PolyGram Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party PolyGram Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Provident Label Group, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Provident Label Group, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Rightsong Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Rightsong Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Roadrunner Records, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Roadrunner Records, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Songs of Universal, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Songs of Universal, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Sony Music Entertainment US Latin(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Sony Music Entertainment US Latin(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Stone Agate Music(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Stone Agate Music(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Stone Diamond Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Stone Diamond Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Unichappell Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Unichappell Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music MGB NA LLC,(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music MGB NA LLC,(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Volcano Entertainment III, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Volcano Entertainment III, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing AB(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing AB(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal/Island Music Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal/Island Music Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal/MCA Music Limited (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Universal/MCA Music Limited (pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party W Chappell Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party W Chappell Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party W.C.M. Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party W.C.M. Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party WB Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party WB Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party WEA International Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party WEA International Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party Warner Chappell Music, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Natha
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Evans Reed on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Joseph Evans Reed added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Evans Reed added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reed, Joseph)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10 August 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #504 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the filing at ECF #495 until further order of the Court. (A redacted version of that same filing is found at ECF #496 .)(cmadr, )
August 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on July 28, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-146. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
August 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 508 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on July 15, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-225. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER on Plaintiffs' objection to Items 2 and 3 on Defendant's privilege log by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/06/2021. (mehlc1, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Courtesy Copy of ORDER from Middle District of Florida Case: 8:19-cv-710-MSS-TGW. (cmadr, )
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 505 MEMORANDUM regarding #504 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motions #504 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/2/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 7/28/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MEMORANDUM regarding #501 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #501 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/28/2021. (rbjsec.)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MEMORANDUM regarding #499 MOTION to Redact #487 Transcript,,, filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Motion #499 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/20/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MOTION to Redact #487 Transcript,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 July 2021. As discussed at the Discovery Conference held on July 15, 2021, an additional Discovery Conference is set for Wednesday, July 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) to appear at the hearing either in person or by video teleconference. Attached to this Minute Order are the video teleconference instructions. (cmadr, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 LETTER Charter's Responsive Letter Brief (Redacted Version) by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #496 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified to add title on 7/19/2021 (rvill, ).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 498 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 7/15/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Corey Michael Sclar Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Corey) Modified on 7/19/2021 (rvill, ).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Letter by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan) Modified to add title on 7/15/2021 (rvill, ).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER setting Discovery Conference for 7/15/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/14/2021. (mehlc1, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 LETTER regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 July 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Case Schedule #486 is granted. In light of the new October 24, 2022 trial start date, the scheduling order is amended with the following deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 10/19/2021. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 6/28/2021. (cmadr, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER SETTING TRIAL: Three-week Jury Trial set to commence 10/24/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson with a Trial Preparation Conference on 9/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/29/21. (jdyne, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MEMORANDUM regarding #486 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify the Case Schedule. Motion #486 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/29/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
June 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on June 10, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-39. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify the Case Schedule by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting #483 Joint MOTION to Continue the Trial Date - CORRECTED. Magistrate Judge Hegarty informed the Court that he supported the parties'joint request for a continuance, and based on his support, the Court will grant the motion. Our next available three week block will start on either October 17 or 24, 2022. That said, the Court does not believe a continuance is a good idea. By October 2021 the case will be more than two and one-half years old. There has been considerable opportunity for discovery, and extensive discovery has indeed taken place. The magistrate judge, the special discovery master, and the Court collectively have devoted extraordinary time and resources to the case. A three-week block was set aside for the case beginning October 18, 2021. It is well known that one of the best motivators for settlement is an impending trial date. The Court believes that a settlement likely would be a better means of resolving the dispute than a three-week trial followed by an appeal and, depending upon the outcome of the appeal, possibly another trial and appeal. This litigation potentially will drag on for the next several years. You are giving up an opportunity to accelerate the resolution by at least one year if not more, whether by settlement or trial, not to mention an opportunity to avoid the additional legal fees and other costs that will be incurred during the one-year period of additional delay. Nevertheless, if your clients after considering the Court's thoughts want a continuance, you may have it. Contact Chambers at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov and notify us of your choice of the two start dates. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/18/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER finding as moot #482 Joint MOTION to Continue The Trial Date. Corrected motion filed at ECF No. 483. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/18/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Joint MOTION to Continue the Trial Date - CORRECTED by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Joint MOTION to Continue The Trial Date by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 6/10/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 June 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53, I appointed Regina M. Rodriguez, Esq., to serve as Special Master until further order of this Court. ECF #143 . Ms. Rodriguez' confirmation as a United States District Judge necessitates her withdrawal as Special Master from this lawsuit. To that end, I instructed the parties by email on May 10, 2021 that I would be hearing all discovery matters. I hereby release Ms. Rodriguez from all further duties as Special Master. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on May 25, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-98. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER setting June 28, 2021 as the deadline to bring to the Court's attention any deficiencies in an opposing party's discovery production. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/28/2021. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Amended re #476 Discovery Hearing. Amended to reflect correct courtroom deputy (highlighted). FTR: A-501. (rkeec)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 5/25/2021. FTR: A-501. (rkeec)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Denton Doak on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney David Denton Doak added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Denton Doak added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Doak, David)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has requested, received and reviewed in camera the redacted and unredacted versions of the Hash Report. The Court finds that the redactions, which are limited to columns G and H of the report, were properly made on grounds of attorney work product and in compliance with the Court's April 8, 2021 order. The Court requests that counsel for the parties not raise substantive issues by sending emails to this Court's Chambers unless invited to do so. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/12/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 May 2021. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Compel. ECF #438 . The Motion is fully briefed (ECF #448 and ECF #456 ). The Court heard oral argument (ECF #462 ) and reviewed the subject documents in camera. For the reasons explained in the Court's May 3, 2021 email to the parties, the Motion #437 is denied.(cmadr, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Phillip R. Malone was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (tnguy)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Raphael Julian Ginsburg on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Raphael Julian Ginsburg added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Raphael Julian Ginsburg added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ginsburg, Raphael)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 LETTER Brief regarding Mabb Deposition by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Krishna Shah on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Krishna Shah added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Krishna Shah added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shah, Krishna)
May 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 SURREPLY re #437 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Respondent Recording Industry Association of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on April 29, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-51. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
May 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on April 26, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-27. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by D. Seth Fortenbery on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney D. Seth Fortenbery added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney D. Seth Fortenbery added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fortenbery, D.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Anne Rose on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Jessica Anne Rose added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Anne Rose added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rose, Jessica)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), William E. O'Neil was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (tnguy)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 462 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Grigsby, Stacey)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Hardy Ehlers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ehlers, John)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dylan I. Scher on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Dylan I. Scher added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dylan I. Scher added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Scher, Dylan)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 April 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2 and for good cause shown, Plaintiff's and RIAA's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #450 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the filing at ECF #438 until further order of the Court. (A redacted version of that same filing is found at ECF #437 .) In addition, the Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the filing at ECF #449 until further order of the Court. (A redacted version of that same filing is found at ECF #448 .)(cmadr, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), John Hardy Ehlers was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #455 Reply by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified to add title on 4/27/2021 (rvill, ).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 455 REPLY to Response to #437 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit H)(Schapiro, Andrew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 4/26/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MINUTE ORDER Discovery Conference set for 4/26/2021 03:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/26/2021. (cthom, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 April 2021. Pursuant to the parties' emailed request, oral argument set on Defendant's Motion to Compel (ECF #438 ) on Thursday, April 29, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is rescheduled to 9:30 a.m. on that same morning. (Time Change Only). (cmadr, )
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MEMORANDUM regarding #450 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Unichappell Music Inc. Motion #450 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/22/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Respondent Recording Industry Association of America, The. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 449 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #448 by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Respondent Recording Industry Association of America, The.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Marks, #2 Declaration of Matthew J. Oppenheim, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified to add title on 4/22/2021 (rvill, ).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 448 BRIEF in Opposition to #437 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Respondent Recording Industry Association of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Marks, #2 Declaration of Matthew J. Oppenheim, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 April 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict #441 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the filing at ECF #425 (which is Plaintiff's Objection to the Special Master's March 16, 2021 Order) and the filing's two attachments, ECF 425-5 and 425-6, until further order of the Court. The Court notes that a redacted version of that same filing is found at ECF #424 .(cmadr, )
April 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on April 7, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-46. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Mark Y. Chen was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Andrew David Castricone was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 443 MINUTE ORDER Oral Argument set for 4/29/2021, at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Any Response to the Motion to Compel is due on or before April 21, 2021. Any Reply is due April 26, 2021. The Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) to appear at the hearing either in person or by video teleconference. Attached to this Minute Order are the video teleconference instructions. Anyone appearing by telephone shall call the following conference line at: Number: 888-278-0296; Access code: 8212991# Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/13/2021. (rkeec)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MEMORANDUM regarding #441 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Motion #441 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/13/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MEMORANDUM regarding #437 MOTION to Compel filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #437 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/12/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
April 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 439 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on April 1, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-66. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #437 Motion by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified to add title on 4/12/2021 (rvill, ).
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MOTION to Compel by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Schapiro, Andrew)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #362 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; granting in part and denying in part #390 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/8/21.(jdyne, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER Amended the Court's Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/7/2021. (cthom, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 434 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Oral Argument Hearing held on 4/7/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MEMORANDUM regarding #432 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #321 Order on Motion for Order, Motion to Amend 502(d) Order filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #432 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/7/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #321 Order on Motion for Order,,, Motion to Amend 502(d) Order by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 431 RESPONSE to #424 Objections,,,,,,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Schapiro Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H, #10 Exhibit Ex. I)(Schapiro, Andrew)
April 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 430 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on March 19, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-35. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
April 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 429 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on March 18, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-110. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 April 2021. The Court will hear oral arguments on Plaintiffs' Objection (ECF #424 , #425 ) on Wednesday, April 7, 2021 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Defendant shall file its Response on or before April 5, 2021.The Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) to appear at the hearing either in person or by video teleconference. Attached to this Minute Order are the video teleconference instructions. (cmadr, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 427 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Oral Argument Hearing held on 4/1/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) Modified to correct text on 4/1/2021 (cthom, ).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 426 RESPONSE to #421 Objections to Special Master's March 16, 2021 Order by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gould, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #424 Objections by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Grigsby Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Grigsby, Stacey) Modified to add title on 3/30/2021 (rvill, ).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 424 OBJECTIONS to SPECIAL MASTER'S MARCH 16, 2021 ORDER by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Grigsby Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9)(Grigsby, Stacey)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE ORDER re: #421 Objections filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Oral Argument by video teleconference set for 4/1/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/29/2021. (cthom, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 March 2021. The Objection to Special Master's January 22, 2021 Order Denying Discovery into Charter's Deterrence Defense #346 is denied. (cmadr, )
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 421 OBJECTIONS to Special Master's March 16, 2021 Order by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ranahan, Erin)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 420 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 3/19/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 419 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Oral Argument Hearing held on 3/18/2021. Discovery Hearing set for 3/19/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 March 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Redact Portions of February 9, 2021 Hearing Transcript #407 is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall direct the court reporter to redact lines 711 on page 18 of the transcript at ECF #372 . The redacted version of the transcript shall be made available on the public docket sheet. The Clerk of the Court shall place the unredacted version of the transcript (ECF 372) under Level 1 Restriction status until further order of the Court.(cmadr, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 17 March 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File under Level 1 Restriction #410 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the complete filing at ECF #409 until further order of the Court. The Court notes that a redacted version of that same filing is found at ECF #408 .(cmadr, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 416 REPLY to Response to #390 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Corrected Reply in Support of Their Objections to February 23, 2021 Discovery Orders filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 REPLY to Response to #390 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Objections to February 23, 2021 Discovery Orders filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MINUTE ORDER Oral Arguments re: #346 Objections set for 3/18/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/15/2021. (cthom, )
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 413 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Arguments held on March 9, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-44. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11 March 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File under Level 1 Restriction #393 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Level 1 Restriction the complete filing at ECF #391 until further order of the Court. The Court notes that a redacted version of that same filing is found at ECF #390 .(cmadr, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MEMORANDUM regarding #407 Unopposed MOTION to Redact #372 Transcript filed by Charter Communications, Inc. and #410 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motions #407 and #410 are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/11/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #408 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified to add title on 3/11/2021 (rvill, ).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 RESPONSE to #390 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Unopposed MOTION to Redact #372 Transcript,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 406 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Oral Argument Hearing held on 3/9/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Todd Steven Anten on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc. (Anten, Todd)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Todd Steven Anten was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/8/2021. (jgonz, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #398 Joint Motion for Entry of Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Remote Review of Source Code by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/08/2021. The Court will enter the parties' proposed stipulated protective order separately. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MEMORANDUM regarding #398 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Remote Review of Source Code. Motion #398 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/8/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 400 TRANSCRIPT of In Court Hearing held on February 23, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-256. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
March 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 TRANSCRIPT of In Court Hearing held on February 22, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-236. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Remote Review of Source Code by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MINUTE ORDER Oral Argument set for 3/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/5/2021. (cthom, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER Plaintiffs' #349 Objection filed February 3, 2021 is sustained. The eight spreadsheets shall be produced in their entirety. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/5/2021`. (cthom, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katy Akopjan on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Katy Akopjan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katy Akopjan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Akopjan, Katy)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM regarding #393 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. Motion #393 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/4/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 March 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' emailed request to amend the scheduling order is granted as follows: Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2021. (cmadr, )
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #390 Objection by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified to add title on 3/4/2021 (rvill, ).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO FEBRUARY 23, 2021 DISCOVERY ORDERS by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Discovery Letter and Exhibits by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Letter Brief for February 22, 2021 Hearing, #2 Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief)(Grigsby, Stacey) Modified to add title on 3/3/2021 (rvill, ).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anders Linderot on behalf of Plaintiffs (Linderot, Anders) Modified on 3/3/2021 (rvill, ).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 REPLY to Response to #362 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #345 Status Conference,, Set/Reset Hearings, regarding Privilege Log Item 28 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: In Court Hearing held on 2/23/2021. FTR: A201. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Attorney Roster, #2 Defendant Attorney Roster) (cthom, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael F. Trombetta on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Michael F. Trombetta added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael F. Trombetta added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Trombetta, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: In Court Hearing held on 2/22/2021. Hearing will continue tomorrow, February 23, 2021, at 9:15 a.m. FTR: A201. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Attorney Roster, #2 Defendants' Attorney Roster) (cthom, )
February 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Plaintiffs Position on Pending Discovery issues as Requested by the Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Counter Claimant UMG Recordings, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sperling, Jonathan) Modified to add title on 2/22/2021 (rvill, ).
February 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Roster of In-Person Attendees for February 22, 2021 Hearing by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC (Sperling, Jonathan)
February 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE of Defendant's Roster of In-Person Attendees for Feb. 22 Hearing by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on February 18, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-38. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
February 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Letter by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Defendants Position on Pending Discovery Issues as Requested by the Magistrate Judge)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified to add title on 2/22/2021 (rvill, ).
February 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.'s Position on Pending Discovery issues as Requested by the Magistrate Judge by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified to add title on 2/22/2021 (rvill, ).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John J. Rosenthal on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney John J. Rosenthal added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John J. Rosenthal added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John J. Rosenthal added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John J. Rosenthal added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John J. Rosenthal added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John J. Rosenthal added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rosenthal, John)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 2/18/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MINUTE ORDER Discovery Hearing set for today, 2/18/2021, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Video-Teleconference. Parties may appear by video or telephone by following the instructions attached as the main document to this entry. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/18/2021. (cthom, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 RESPONSE to #363 MOTION to Clarify Comments from Status Conference Following Denial of Defendants Motion to Compel Production of the Hash Report filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grace E. Chang on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Grace E. Chang added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Grace E. Chang added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Chang, Grace)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on February 9, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-58. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 RESPONSE to #362 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO CHARTERS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES RULING REGARDING PRIVILEGE LOG ITEM 28 filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 REPLY to #346 Objections,,,,,,,, PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS JANUARY 22, 2021 ORDER DENYING DISCOVERY INTO CHARTERS DETERRENCE DEFENSE by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF J. HARDY EHLERS, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8)(Sperling, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 REPLY to #365 Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Jan. 27, 2021 Order by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MINUTE ORDER re: In Court Hearing scheduled for Monday, February 22, 2021 at 9:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty in Courtroom A201 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. Parties who are not able to appear in person may appear by video-teleconference by following the instructions attached to this entry. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/16/2021. (cthom, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11 February 2021. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File under Level 1 Restriction #350 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Restriction Level 1 the filing at ECF #349 until further order of the Court.(cmadr, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM regarding #363 MOTION to Clarify Comments from Status Conference Following Denial of Defendants Motion to Compel Production of the Hash Report. Motion #363 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/11/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE to #351 Objections,,,,,,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 RESPONSE to #346 Objections,,,,,,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION to Clarify Comments from Status Conference Following Denial of Defendants Motion to Compel Production of the Hash Report by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #345 Status Conference,, Set/Reset Hearings, regarding Privilege Log Item 28 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 361 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Oral Argument Hearing held on 2/9/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) Modified to correct text on 2/9/2021 (cthom, ).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 February 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The Court will hear additional oral arguments on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF #262 ) on Tuesday, February 9, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER re: 358 Minute Order. The Trial Preparation Conference is RESET for 9/9/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/8/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE ORDER: The Trial Preparation Conference is RESET for 9/9/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/8/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on February 1, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-94. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on January 28, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-44. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #354 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #146 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, the Case Schedule. Case deadlines are extended as follows: Close of Fact Discovery is 4/2/2021; Designation of Affirmative Experts due 4/5/2021; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 5/10/2021; Expert Discovery cutoff is 6/10/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2021; Daubert Motions due by 6/30/2021. The Court will vacate the 8/2/2021 trial preparation conference. However, the Court is not available in late September to reset as the parties' proposed. The Court is available on 9/7/2021 at 9:00; 9/8/2021 at 9:00 or 9/9/2021 at 9:00. The Court requests that the parties confer and then notify Chambers at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov within one week of the date you select. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/5/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #146 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, the Case Schedule by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 February 2021. Before the Court are Plaintiffs' Objection (ECF #346 ) to the Special Master's Order of January 22, 2021 and Plaintiffs' Objection (ECF #349 ) to the Special Master's Order of January 27, 2021. Defendant has until Wednesday, February 10, 2021 to file any Response, and Plaintiffs have until Tuesday, February 16, 2021 to file any Reply. (cmadr, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MEMORANDUM regarding #350 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. Motion #350 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/4/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 OBJECTIONS to Special Master's Jan. 27, 2021 Order (REDACTED) by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted))(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 OBJECTIONS to Special Master's Jan. 27, 2021 Order by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 2/1/2021. An In Court Hearing is set for 2/22/2021 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 201 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
January 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Letter by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan) Modified to add title on 2/1/2021 (rvill, ).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 OBJECTIONS to Special Masters January 22, 2021 Order Denying Discovery Into Charters Deterrence Defense by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Sperling, Jonathan)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 1/28/2021. Status Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2021: #1 VTC Instructions) (cthom, ).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER to #342 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulated Remote Deposition Protocol by Special Master Special Master's Order Regarding Protocol for Conducting Remote Depositions by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom, ).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MEMORANDUM regarding #342 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulated Remote Deposition Protocol by Special Master filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #342 is referred to the Special Master, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/28/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulated Remote Deposition Protocol by Special Master by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER to #339 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding Further Source Code Review by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom, ).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MEMORANDUM regarding #339 Joint MOTION for Discovery filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #336 is referred to the Special Master, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/22/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Joint MOTION for Discovery by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 FIRST STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO THE #63 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 January 2021. (cmadr, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 January 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' "Joint Expedited Motion for Entry of First Stipulated Amendment to the Protective Order" #334 is granted. For issuance of the First Stipulated Amendment to the Protective Order, the parties are directed to submit an editable copy (i.e., Word) to hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov.(cmadr, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stacey Kamya Grigsby on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified on 1/21/2021 (rvill, ).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MEMORANDUM regarding #334 Joint MOTION for Order to Expedite Entry of First Stipulated Amendment to the Protective Order. Motion #334 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/21/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Joint MOTION for Order to Expedite Entry of First Stipulated Amendment to the #63 Protective Order by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sperling, Jonathan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE Special Master's Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Unredacted CATS Abuse Summary Reports by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7 January 2021. Therefore, the Motion to Compel Production of Documents #266 is denied without prejudice subject to re-raising the issue if circumstances justify.(cmadr, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 RESPONSE to #329 Objections, by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Hardy Ehlers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Sperling, Jonathan)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on December 18, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-100. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 OBJECTIONS to Special Master's 12/21 Ruling re: Charter's Privilege Log Item 28 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Dec. A. Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Phillip Aaron Lee Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Phillip) Modified on 12/24/2020 (rvill, ).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander Kaplan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kaplan, Alexander) Modified on 12/23/2020 (rvill, ).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Special Master's Order Regarding Charter's Motion to Compel Audible Magic's Compliance With Subpoena Duces Tecum by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez.. (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified to add title on 12/30/2020 (rvill, ).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE Special Master's Order Regarding Charter's Motion to Compel RIAA's Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER Regarding Charter's Restricted #247 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom, ).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE Special Master's Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Reconsideration of Special Master's Order on Charter's Motion to Compel MarkMonitor's Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 322 AMENDED MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2020. (cthom, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 December 2020. The Motion for Entry of an Order #283 is granted to the extent that Defendant shall produce documents it has previously withheld as privileged, as requested in the Motion. Such production by itself shall not waive attorney/client or attorney work product privilege that otherwise applies to the produced documents, in this case or any other federal or state proceeding. The Court advises Defendant to cast a wide net, and be as aggressive as possible, in producing such documents from its privilege log. This Order is not intended as a determination that any documents Defendant produces are in fact privileged. Plaintiffs retain all arguments that Defendant has inappropriately designated a document as privileged.(cmadr, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2020. #262 Motion to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Status Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (cthom, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Status Conference held on December 15, 2020 before Judge Jackson. Pages: 1-16. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (smitc, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REPLY to Response to #283 MOTION for Order to Permit Production Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MINUTE ORDER re: #266 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing by video-teleconference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/16/2020. (cthom, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Status Conference via video teleconference held on 12/15/2020. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER re: 311 MINUTE ORDER re: #310 Letter and #308 Letter. A Status Conference is set for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the hearing will be held by video teleconference. The Court's staff will provide connection instructions to the parties by email prior to the hearing. Please note that only counsel intending to speak during the conference should appear by video. All others and the general public may listen in by dialing 1-888-204-5984 and entering access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/14/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #313 MOTION to Withdraw - Attorney Nicholas M. Lampros. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/11/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas M. Lampros by Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sahni, Neema)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Counterclaims by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MINUTE ORDER re: #310 Letter and #308 Letter. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court directs that the parties use dial-in number 1-888-204-5984 and enter access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/7/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 LETTER in response to Letter Requesting Conference by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MINUTE ORDER re: #308 Letter. The Court directs counsel to jointly contact Chambers at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to schedule a telephonic conference. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/4/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 LETTER Requesting Conference by Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #306 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas Patrick Lane is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/2/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Thomas Patrick Lane) by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Ranahan, Erin)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 BRIEF in Opposition to #283 MOTION for Order to Permit Production Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sperling, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 REPLY to Response to #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ANSWER/REPLY to #295 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(The ), Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc.(The), Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #294 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 REPLY to Response to #266 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 14)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER to #297 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding Source Code Review by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom,).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 November 2020. Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 7.2, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File under Level 1 Restriction #289 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Restriction Level 1 the filing at ECF #288 until further order of the Court.(cmadr, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MEMORANDUM regarding #297 Joint MOTION for Discovery filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #297 is referred to Magistrate Judge Special Master, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/20/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Joint MOTION for Discovery by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #295 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 AMENDED ANSWER to #165 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc., Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 REPLY to Response to #258 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #291 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2020. For good cause shown, the deadline for filing the reply to the Motion to Compel (ECF 262) is extended to November 25, 2020, and the deadline for filing the reply to the Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Rule 502(d) is extended to December 16, 2020. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MEMORANDUM regarding #291 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #283 MOTION for Order to Permit Production Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege. Motion #291 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #283 MOTION for Order to Permit Production Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D), #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sperling, Jonathan)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MEMORANDUM regarding #289 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict. Motion #289 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/10/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: unredacted version of #287 by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Oppenheim)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 11/18/2020 (rvill, ).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 BRIEF in Opposition to #266 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Oppenheim)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MINUTE ORDER re: #191 Letter filed by Charter Communications, Inc. In ruling on pending motions [ECF No. 284] the Court overlooked a letter from the defendant requesting permission to file another dispositive motion. Having reviewed the letter, it is not clear that such a motion should be necessary. Rather, the Court's impression is that the "subset of Plaintiffs" that filed the two counterclaims regarding additional works allegedly infringed after the claim period might wish to reconsider their position in light of defendant's clarified position that its declaratory counterclaims relate only to the works at issue (meaning the 11,027 works that are the focus of the case). Counsel are directed to confer again re this matter. However, if the subset persists in its desire to expand the case beyond the claim period that has been the focus of attention throughout, then defendant may file its motion. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/9/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM regarding #283 MOTION for Order to Permit Production Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Motion #283 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/5/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #189 Motion to Dismiss; granting #192 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting #201 Motion for Leave to Restrict ; granting #215 Motion for Leave to Restrict ; granting #248 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/5/20.(jdyne, )
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION for Order to Permit Production Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 RESPONSE to #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #278 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/03/2020. Defendant shall file its Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ECF 262) by November 4, 2020. Plaintiffs have until November 18, 2020 to file their Reply. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 BRIEF in Opposition to #258 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Gould, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM regarding #278 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #278 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/2/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE re #264 Objections,,,,,,,, Filing of Exhibit 10 to Objection by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC (Sahni, Neema)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle A. Clark on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Michelle A. Clark added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle A. Clark added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Clark, Michelle)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 RESPONSE to #264 Objections,,,,,,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Schapiro, Andrew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 BRIEF in Opposition to #258 MOTION to Compel Third Party Audible Magic Corporation's Opposition to Charter Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Compel filed by Respondent Audible Magic Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Vance Ikezoye)(Ghaffari, Kayven)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #270 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Restrict, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/20/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MEMORANDUM regarding #266 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Motion #266 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/20/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan A. Hamstra on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Nathan A. Hamstra added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan A. Hamstra added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hamstra, Nathan)
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit 5 to #266 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 10/20/2020 (rvill, ).
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit 4 to #266 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 10/20/2020 (rvill, ).
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted version of #266 by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 10/20/2020 (rvill, ).
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schapiro, Andrew)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REPLY to Response to #248 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 OBJECTIONS to #261 Notice (Other) Partial Objection to Special Masters October 8, 2020 Order Regarding Parties Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Claimant Sony Music Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Sahni, Neema)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM regarding #262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege. Motion #262 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/13/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Compel Production of All Documents Related to Charters Spoliation Listed on Charters Privilege Log or Otherwise Withheld on the Basis of Privilege by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitchell A. Kamin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kamin, Mitchell)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER Regarding Parties' Motions to Compel by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom, ).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM regarding Motions to Compel at ECF Nos. #254 and #258 . Motions #254 and #258 are referred to the Special Master. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/8/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE to #248 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gould, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Charter's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Filed pursuant to 21 Order from 20-mc-00168. (rvill,)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Filed pursuant to 16 Order from 20-mc-00152.(rvill, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Filed pursuant to 16 Order from 20-mc-00152. (rvill, ) Modified to correct text on 10/7/2020 (rvill, ).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Respondent Recording Industry Association of America. Filed pursuant 16 Order from 20-mc-00152. (rvill, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Filed pursuant to 16 Order from 20-cv-00152. (rvill, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 (RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1) ORDER re: #207 Motion by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez.. (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom, ).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE Special Master's Order Regarding Charter's Privilege Log Items 19-28 by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE Special Masters Order re Motion for Protective Order by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM regarding Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum #245 referred to the Special Master. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/24/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE ORDER: #247 Motion Seeking Transfer to the Special Master is granted. The Motion to Compel at ECF No. 245 will be referred to the Special Master. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/24/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #243 Transcript,,, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Schapiro, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Filed pursuant to 22 Amended Order from 20-mc-00157. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(rvill, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Respondent Jill Lesser. Filed pursuant to 22 Amended Order from 20-mc-00157. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(rvill, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Filed pursuant to 22 Amended Order from 20-mc-00157. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(rvill, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE Special Masters Order re PII Compliance by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument/In Court Hearing held on September 9, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-236. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. In Court Hearing held on 9/9/2020. Sustaining in part and overruling in part, as outlined on the record, #199 Objection. Sustaining in part and overruling in part, as outlined on the record, #233 Objection. FTR: A-501. (rkeec)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER Re: #196 Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cthom, ).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Todd Steven Anten on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Todd Steven Anten added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Steven Anten added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Anten, Todd)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Linda J. Brewer on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Linda J. Brewer added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Linda J. Brewer added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Brewer, Linda)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Harnack Huebert on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Allison Harnack Huebert added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Harnack Huebert added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Huebert, Allison)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 August 2020. Before the Court are Plaintiffs' Partial Objection to Special Master's May 29, 2020 Order Resolving Discovery Disputes (ECF #199 ) and Plaintiffs' Partial Objection to Special Master's August 12, 2020 Order Resolving Discovery Disputes (ECF #233 ). The Court will hear oral argument on these matters on Wednesday, September 9, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 RESPONSE to #233 OBJECTION to filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JENNIFER A. GOLINVEAUX, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) Modified on 8/27/2020 (apesa, ).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMORANDUM regarding #233 OBJECTIONS to #230 Restricted Document - Level 1 Plaintiffs Partial Objection to Special Masters August 12, 2020 Order Resolving Discovery Disputes. Objection referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/26/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Letter, from Benjamin Norman Pierce. (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 OBJECTIONS to #230 Restricted Document - Level 1 Plaintiffs Partial Objection to Special Masters August 12, 2020 Order Resolving Discovery Disputes by Plaintiffs Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Claimants Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Envelope 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 8/26/2020 to add gavel (apesa, ).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Restricted Document - Level 2 (apesa, ) Modified to correct text pursuant to #244 on 10/1/2020 (rvill, ).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REPLY to Response to #196 MOTION for Order to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order filed by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema Sahni, #2 Exhibit)(Sperling, Jonathan)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez.. (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 8/13/2020 to add text (apesa, ).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REPLY to Response to #192 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #165 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, [Charter Communication, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Counterclaims One and Two], filed by Counter Claimant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REPLY to Response to #189 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER re: Plaintiffs' Expedited #202 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadline by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina) Modified on 3/2/2021 (cthom, ).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Notice of Firm Name Change by Janette Lee Ferguson (Ferguson, Janette)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (apesa, ) Modified to correct text pursuant to #244 on 10/1/2020 (rvill, ).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 BRIEF in Opposition to #196 MOTION for Order to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Wayne Coleman, #2 Declaration of Erin Ranahan, #3 Exhibit 1 to Ranahan Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Ranahan Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Ranahan Decl.)(Ranahan, Erin)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM regarding #196 Motion to Deny Coleman's Designation as Qualified Person, #202 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadline in Special Master, and #207 Motion to Compel Compliance with SDT, as well as any letter filed by Charter's customers objecting to production of information are referred to Special Master by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/29/2020. Text Only Entry (cthom, ) Modified to correct text on 7/29/2020 (cthom, ).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM regarding #196 MOTION for Order to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order; #199 Plaintiffs' Partial Objection to Special Master's May 29, 2020 Order Resolving Discovery Disputes; #202 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Stay Discovery Deadline Set Forth In July 6, 2020 Order Issued by Special Master Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Objection Thereto; #207 Charter's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum. Motions #196 , #199 , #202 , and #207 as well as any letters filed from Charter's customers objecting to production of information are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/29/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 RESPONSE to #192 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #165 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, [Charter Communication, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Counterclaims One and Two], filed by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 BRIEF in Opposition to #189 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #202 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Discovery Deadline Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Objection. This motion became ripe on July 23. This Court started a jury trial, despite the pandemic, on July 27. I have not had a chance to address any of the motions, including this one, and have not had a chance to determine whether I will refer any of them to the magistrate judge. The Court grants a 10-day stay to give it an opportunity to consider the motion more thoughtfully. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/27/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Krishnan Padmanabhan on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Padmanabhan, Krishnan)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 REPLY to Response to #202 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Discovery Deadline Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Objection filed by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 First MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Objector BCS Computers LLC. (McDorman, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OBJECTIONS to Disclosure of Confidential Information by Objector BCS Computers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Restrict Public Access)(McDorman, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Castricone on behalf of MarkMonitor, Inc.Attorney Andrew David Castricone added to party MarkMonitor, Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Andrew David Castricone added to party MarkMonitor, Inc.(pty:res) (Castricone, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 RESPONSE to #199 Objections, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 BRIEF in Opposition to #202 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Discovery Deadline Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Objection filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 LETTER re: #191 Letter , in reply to Plaintiffs' letter dated July 13, 2020 (ECF 198), and in further support of Charter's request for leave to move to dismiss and/or strike Plaintiffs' counterclaims, by Counter Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Andrew H. Schapiro added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew H. Schapiro added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Schapiro, Andrew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Eiseman, IV on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney David Eiseman, IV added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Eiseman, IV added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Eiseman, David)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 REDACTED MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum (From United States District Court Northern District of California Case 20-cv-80084-Misc) by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order by Sallie Kim, United States Magistrate Judge, Northern District Californa)(agarc, )
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 LETTER to Magistrate Judge Hegarty re Transfer by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Charles Kramer Verhoeven added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Kramer Verhoeven added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Verhoeven, Charles)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (athom, ) Modified to correct text pursuant to #244 on 10/1/2020 (rvill, ).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (athom, ) Modified to correct text pursuant to #244 on 10/1/2020 (rvill, ).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Discovery Deadline Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Objection by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Oppenheim, Matthew)Modified to reactivate motion.
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit 16 to #199 Partial Objection to Special Master Order by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 to ECF 199)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 7/14/2020 to add title of document (athom, ).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 OBJECTIONS to #181 Notice (Other), #190 Notice (Other) Partial Objection to Special Master Order by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24)(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 7/29/2020 to change event to motion (apesa, ).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 LETTER re: #191 Letter by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: (apesa, ) Modified to correct text pursuant to #244 on 10/1/2020 (rvill, ).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION for Order to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sperling, Jonathan)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Hardy Ehlers on behalf of All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Amici Curiae Copyright Law Professors, Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Regina M. Rodriguez, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLCAttorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party All Blacks U.S.A., INC.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Amici Curiae Copyright Law Professors(pty:am), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Amici Curiae Copyright Law Professors(pty:am), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Music(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Music(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Music(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Music(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Music(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Music(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Arista Records LLC(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Century Family, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Chappell & Co. Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Colgems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Algee Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI April Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Hardy Ehlers added to party EMI Jemaxal Music
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cesie C. Alvarez on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Cesie C. Alvarez added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Cesie C. Alvarez added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Cesie C. Alvarez added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Cesie C. Alvarez added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Cesie C. Alvarez added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cesie C. Alvarez added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Alvarez, Cesie)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER finding as moot #183 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Motion filed at ECF No. 189. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/7/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #165 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, [Charter Communication, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Counterclaims One and Two], by Counter Claimant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charter's Proposed Second Amended Counterclaims)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER re: #184 Answer/Reply to Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss and/or strike Plaintiffs' counterclaims, by Counter Claimant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Special Master's Order Regarding Motions for Reconsideration and Clarification by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying #186 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/6/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Counter Claimants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gould, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Partial ANSWER/REPLY to #165 Amended Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM to Defendant's Counterclaims I and II against All Defendants by All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC, Counter Defendants All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Special Master's Order Regarding Personal Identifying Information by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE Special Master's Order Resolving Discovery Disputes by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael L. Brody on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Michael L. Brody added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Michael L. Brody added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Michael L. Brody added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Brody added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Brody, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/20/2020. For good cause shown, the Expedited Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Charter Communication, Inc.s [Charter] First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, and to Set a Briefing Schedule [filed May 19, 2020; ECF #177 ] is granted. The parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule for Charter's amended pleading: June 15, 2020 deadline for Plaintiffs to file an answer or other response to the Amended Counterclaims. July 20, 2020 if Plaintiffs' respond with a dispositive motion, the deadline for Charter to respond to Plaintiffs' motion. August 3, 2020 if Plaintiffs' respond with a dispositive motion, the deadline for Plaintiffs to reply in support of the motion(apesa, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM regarding #177 Stipulated MOTION to Expedite RELIEF re: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS, AND TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion #177 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/19/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Stipulated MOTION to Expedite RELIEF re: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS, AND TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE re #167 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Outside the Discovery Limits and on an Expedited Basis Regarding Charters Spoliation of Electronic Data EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED Notice of Special Master Order Re: Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion For Leave by Special Master Regina M. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Regina)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ERRATA re #148 Transcript,,, TO MARCH 4, 2020 HEARING by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik