WildEarth Guardians v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Defendant: Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement and U.S. Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2019cv01073
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/8/2019. Deadline for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/1/2020. (bwilk, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak: Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2019. FTR: Courtroom A 402. (bwilk, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Brenton, Kyle)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of the Interior.(Brenton, Kyle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of the InteriorAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party U.S. Department of the Interior(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to #8 Status Report filed by WildEarth Guardians, and in light of the fact that Defendants have yet to enter an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2019 09:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 7/8/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. At least 21 days in advance of the scheduling conference, the parties shall meet and attempt to agree upon a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The Court strongly encourages the parties to meet face to face, but should that prove impossible, the parties may meet by telephone conference. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 7/1/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/3/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Wilcox, Stuart)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon all Defendants with answer due within 30 days (by 5/22/2019) under the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(C), defendant(s) Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; U.S. Department of the Interior served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons)(Wilcox, Stuart)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/24/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/18/2019. (jgonz, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/18/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01073-PAB. (athom, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of the Interior (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6630942)Attorney Stuart N. Wilcox added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WildEarth Guardians' FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit Withdrawal of WildEarth Guardians' Petition, #3 Exhibit WildEarth Guardians' Correpsondence with Defendants, #4 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Attorney General Summons, #7 Summons OSMRE Summons, #8 Summons Civil Process Clerk Summons, #9 Summons U.S. Department of the Interior Summons)(Wilcox, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Stuart N. Wilcox
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?