Ericson v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Joni Erickson, Joni Ericson and Martin
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01168
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/3/2019. The parties will attempt to agree on the contents of the Administrative Record by no later than 7/22/2019. Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record by 7/29/2019.Discovery due by 8/19/2019.Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/4/2019. Defendants Brief due by 11/1/2019. Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 11/15/2019. Joint Motion for Determination due 11/18/2019. (bwilk, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/3/2019 granting #15 Motion to Vacate. Text Only Entry(bwilk, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by Joni Ericson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/3/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Joni Ericson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bulger, Thomas)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order in an ERISA action by Plaintiff Joni Ericson. (Bulger, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, the Clerk of the Court is ordered to amend the caption to correctly spell Plaintiff's last name as "Ericson." By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5.21.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, filed by Joni Erickson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joni Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document)(Bulger, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/ 13/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/13/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01168-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America All parties do not consent.. (Englert, Jack)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jack M. Englert, Jr added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Englert, Jack)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/26/19, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference in an Erisa Action and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 6/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joni Erickson. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Bulger, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6645905)Attorney Thomas A. Bulger added to party Joni Erickson(pty:pla), filed by Joni Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed summons)(Bulger, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericson v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Erickson
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Ericson
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?