Abram v. CJC et al
Plaintiff: Howard Abram
Defendant: Janet King, CJC, Liz O'Neal and Trinity Food Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv01649
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/29/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1649-LTB-GPG (angar, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #15 ) is granted to and including August 9, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with the Court's June 10, 2019, order to amend (ECF No. #10 ) by August 9, 2019, this action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/26/2019. (angar, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER by Plaintiff Howard Abram. (angar, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/23/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1649-LTB (angar, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacob Russell Woods on behalf of Trinity Food ServicesAttorney Jacob Russell Woods added to party Trinity Food Services(pty:dft) (Woods, Jacob)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laura I. Pearson on behalf of Trinity Food ServicesAttorney Laura I. Pearson added to party Trinity Food Services(pty:dft) (Pearson, Laura)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Ringel on behalf of Trinity Food ServicesAttorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Trinity Food Services(pty:dft) (Ringel, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/10/2019. (angar, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of State Docket Sheet by Defendants CJC, Janet King, Liz O'Neal (Ritchie, Mary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Margaret Ritchie on behalf of CJC, Janet King, Liz O'Neal (Ritchie, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Clerk of Court Effecting Service of Summons, Complaint, Blank Answer upon Trinity Food Service, El Paso County Attorney, Janet King, Liz O'Neil, CJC on 5/28/2019. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Under Simplified Civil Procedure against CJC, Janet King, Liz O'Neal, Trinity Food Services, filed by Howard Abram.(cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX090611 (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit D - Correcting Case Number by Defendants CJC, Janet King, Liz O'Neal. (Ritchie, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liz O'Neal, Janet King, CJC from El Paso County Court, Case Number 2019C1610. (Filing fee $ 400)., filed by Liz O'Neal, Janet King, CJC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Return of Service, #4 Exhibit D - State Notice of Removal to all Parties, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Ritchie, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram v. CJC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet King
Represented By: Mary Margaret Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJC
Represented By: Mary Margaret Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz O'Neal
Represented By: Mary Margaret Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Food Services
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Laura I. Pearson
Represented By: Jacob Russell Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Abram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?