Kargbo v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Gibril Kargbo and Gibril K. Kargbo
Defendant: Christopher Wray, Andrew Lambrecht, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Service, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv01703
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/22/19. Amended to clarify that this case is dismissed with prejudice. (rebsec)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/22/19. The Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #9 is approved; under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice; and this case is closed. (rebsec)
July 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Gibril K. Kargbo (Hacking, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY by Plaintiff Gibril K. Kargbo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice: The #5 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued. Each summons must have a FULL caption - ALL defendants must be listed in the caption in order to be issued. Please complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry (athom, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to ALL DEFENDANTS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Gibril K. Kargbo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hacking, James)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/12/2019. (athom, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. The Summons supplied has an incomplete party caption for the Defendants, all Defendants must be named and the Summons cannot include "et al". (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6737077)Attorney James O. Hacking, III added to party Gibril Kargbo(pty:pla), filed by Gibril Kargbo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kargbo v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibril Kargbo
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibril K. Kargbo
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?