Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management

Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv01728
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Vacate Deadlines and Stay Proceedings. The request for a Stay is denied, but the Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM, and associated deadlines, are VACATED to be reset, if necessary, if the parties are unable to reach a settlement. The 8/19/2019 deadline for the parties to file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, however, shall remain in place. The parties shall file Dismissal Papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 9/13/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/02/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Steiner, Logan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Bureau of Land Management.(Steiner, Logan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Bureau of Land Management served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (McVean, Courtney) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct Answer Deadline pursuant to FOIA(jgonz, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk for Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Summons for William Barr) (rvill, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Consent Form due by 8/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before August 12, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/13/19. (morti, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6741573)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McVean, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Courtney Renee McVean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?