Candelaria v. Struck et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Candelaria
Defendant: Struck (I), Roberto (I) Ramirez, Esquibels (I), Mark Kubic, Ashley (I) Weiner, Roberto Ramirez, Stefanie (I) Gaffigan, Mark (I) Kubic, Struck, Stefanie Gaffigan, Megan A. Ring, Megan (I) A. Ring, Esquibels and Ashley Weiner
Case Number: 1:2019cv03172
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
2 Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, as indicated by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/31/19. (jdyne, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03172-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Carlos Candelaria All parties do not consent.. (evana, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECFNo. #7 ) is accepted and adopted. That claim two in the Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) is dismissed pursuant to the rule in Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994), and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) & (iii).by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/16/2019. That Defendants Adams County District Court Judge Roberto Ramirez, Adams County Deputy District Attorney Ashley Weiner, Colorado State Public Defender Megan A. Ring, and Colorado State Deputy Public Defender Stefanie Gaffigan are dismissed as parties to this action. That this case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/16/2019.(evana, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that claim two in the Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) be dismissed. That Defendants Adams County District Court Judge Roberto Ramirez, Adams County Deputy District Attorney Ashley Weiner, Colorado State Public Defender Megan A. Ring, and Colorado State Deputy Public Defender Stefanie Gaffigan be dismissed as parties to this action. That claim one in the Prisoner Complaint be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/20/2019. (evana, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is under review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: Perform duties set forth in D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1.; Hear and determine pretrial matters, including all nondispositive motions and other requests seeking court action; Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, at the magistrate judge's discretion; Submit recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; Submit recommendations for disposition of all or part of this action as required under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, 28 U.S.C. 1915, 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and/or 42 U.S.C. 1997e; Determine and resolve nondispositive post-judgment motions and other requests seeking court action. by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/19/2019. (evana, )
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/18/2019. All future documents should be designated as 19-cv-3172 LTB (evana, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. That within thirty days of the date of this Order Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $6.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents 20 percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiff's prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. That after payment of the initial partial filing fee Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's prison account monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account until Plaintiff has paid the total filing fee of $350.00. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Interference by Plaintiff in the submission of these funds will result in the dismissal of this action. That Plaintiff's custodian shall continue to disburse monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison account until full payment of the filing fee has been paid to the Court, even after disposition of the case and regardless of whether relief is granted or denied. That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us., by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/8/2019.(mailed as ordered)(evana, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Carlos Candelaria. (trvo, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Stefanie Gaffigan, Stefanie (I) Gaffigan, Roberto Ramirez, Roberto (I) Ramirez, Megan A. Ring, Megan (I) A. Ring, Struck, Struck (I), Mark Kubic, Mark (I) Kubic, Esquibels, Esquibels (I), Ashley Weiner, Ashley (I) Weiner, filed by Carlos Candelaria.(trvo, ) Modified to correct entry on 11/8/2019 (trvo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candelaria v. Struck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Candelaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Struck (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto (I) Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esquibels (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kubic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley (I) Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie (I) Gaffigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark (I) Kubic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie Gaffigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan A. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan (I) A. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esquibels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?