Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv03180
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Bureau of Land Management.(Steiner, Logan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: United States Bureau of Land Management answer due 1/6/2020. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (21-day Extension to January 6, 2020) by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. All Defendants. (Steiner, Logan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Answer Deadline and Stay Proceedings until January 16, 2019, to Allow for Settlement Negotiations by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Steiner, Logan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6987717)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McVean, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Courtney Renee McVean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?