Chapman v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Deborah Chapman
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03240
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2020. Discovery Deadline: September 30, 2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline: October 30, 2020. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: June 30, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: July 30, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:15 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A1002. (cthom, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Stephen A. Justino by Stephen A. Justino on behalf of Deborah Chapman (Justino, Stephen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deborah Chapman. (Justino, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Stephen A. Justino was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (kmont)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/31/2019. This case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03240-MEH. (sphil, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Deborah Chapman All parties consent.. (Justino, Stephen)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/21/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/23/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Chase, John)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/20/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-3240-PAB (angar, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen A. Justino on behalf of Deborah ChapmanAttorney Stephen A. Justino added to party Deborah Chapman(pty:pla) (Justino, Stephen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand upon Target Corporation on 10/16/2019. (rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Target Corporation, filed by Deborah Chapman.(rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christy Noelle Redmond on behalf of Target CorporationAttorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft) (Redmond, Christy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Chase, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Ntc to USDC of State Court Docket)(Chase, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv31881. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6998823), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover Sheet), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Guest Incident Report), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (DMV), #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Target SOS Summary), #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal (State Court AOS), #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons), #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Chase, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Christy Noelle Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Chapman
Represented By: Stephen A. Justino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?