Jones v. Skulstad et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Wayne Jones
Defendant: Bent County Correctional Facility, Skulstad, Medina, Larimer County Sheriffs Office, Jane Gildon and Regina Deringer
Case Number: 1:2019cv03610
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/29/2020. (sphil, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to ProceedPursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/29/2020. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. (order e-mailed to DOC inmate account as ordered).(sphil, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Christopher Wayne Jones. (sphil, )
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. 4) is DENIED as erroneously filed in this action. ORDERED that, with a copy of this order, the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff one blank copy of the court-approved Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 form along with the applicable instructions, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/31/2019. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Plaintiff Christopher Wayne Jones. (sphil, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/20/2019. (sphil, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Bent County Correctional Facility, Regina Deringer, Jane Gildon, Larimer County Sheriffs Office, Medina, Skulstad, filed by Christopher Wayne Jones. (Attachments: #1 Letter Addressed to U.S. District Attorney)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Skulstad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bent County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skulstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Gildon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Deringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?