Wilson v. Quinlan et al
Plaintiff: Terance D. Wilson
Defendant: Justin Tolentino, Long, Brendan R. Markham, Brian Weaver, Annable, Jeffrey Quinlan, Ulrich, Felzine, Josh Dorcey and Suppes
Interested Party: TO THE CASE MANAGER/INMATE COORDINATOR OF: Terance D. Wilson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01051
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/3/2020. ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #10 and #13 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Status Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 Supplement Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Terance D. Wilson. (evana, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Terance D. Wilson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/3/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF WILSON'S ACTIONS PENDING BEFORE THIS COURT SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES. All parties are ordered to show cause by June 17, 2020, why the aforementioned cases should not be consolidated for all purposes. If a party fails to respond to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will consider that party unopposed to consolidation. Plaintiff shall file one response to this Order to Show Cause, which has been issued in each of his pending cases. Likewise, Defendants who are named in multiple cases shall file only one response to the Order to Show Cause. Defendants may file a joint response to the Order to Show Cause, if they so choose. Individual responses shall not exceed 4 pages. Joint responses shall not exceed 10 pages, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/3/2020. (evana, ). (Modified on 6/3/2020 attached corrected PDF Case Number)(evana, ).
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction enjoining the Defendants to save, preserve, and discover PEA Calls and video related therein and O.I.G Annable disposition of investigation and for A.G. Office to produce documents requested herein by Plaintiff Terance D. Wilson. (evana, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/26/2020. Text Only Entry. (slibi, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Terance D. Wilson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/19/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction - This is not an Emergency, by Plaintiff Terance D. Wilson. (evana, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Annable waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Josh Dorcey waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Felzine waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Long waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Brendan R. Markham waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Jeffrey Quinlan waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Suppes waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Justin Tolentino waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Ulrich waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Brian Weaver waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (evana, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint for Service of Process. (alave, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/17/2020. Status Conference set for 6/3/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/15/2020. (evana, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/15/2020. This case is directly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01051-CMA-NRN. (sphil, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/15/2020, re: #2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. (order emailed to DOC as requested). (sphil, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Terance D. Wilson. (cmadr, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Annable, Josh Dorcey, Felzine, Long, Brendan R. Markham, Jeffrey Quinlan, Suppes, Justin Tolentino, Ulrich, Brian Weaver, filed by Terance D. Wilson.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Quinlan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Tolentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan R. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felzine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Dorcey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suppes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terance D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TO THE CASE MANAGER/INMATE COORDINATOR OF: Terance D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?