WildEarth Guardians et al v. Mountain Coal Company et al
Plaintiff: High Country Conservation Advocates, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Arch Coal Inc. and Mountain Coal Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01342
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julie Anne Rosen on behalf of Arch Coal Inc., Mountain Coal CompanyAttorney Julie Anne Rosen added to party Arch Coal Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Anne Rosen added to party Mountain Coal Company(pty:dft) (Rosen, Julie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Keith D. Tooley on behalf of Arch Coal Inc., Mountain Coal CompanyAttorney Keith D. Tooley added to party Arch Coal Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Keith D. Tooley added to party Mountain Coal Company(pty:dft) (Tooley, Keith)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure by Defendants Arch Coal Inc., Mountain Coal Company. (Sanderson, James)
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by James W. Sanderson on behalf of Arch Coal Inc., Mountain Coal Company (Sanderson, James)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Keith D. Tooley, Julie A. Rosen and by James W. Sanderson on behalf of Arch Coal Inc., Mountain Coal CompanyAttorney James W. Sanderson added to party Arch Coal Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James W. Sanderson added to party Mountain Coal Company(pty:dft) (Sanderson, James)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/11/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/18/2020. (jgonz, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians, High Country Conservation Advocates, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. All Defendants. (Levine, Neil)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance David A. Nicholas by David Andrew Nicholas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Andrew Nicholas added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney David Andrew Nicholas added to party High Country Conservation Advocates(pty:pla), Attorney David Andrew Nicholas added to party Sierra Club(pty:pla), Attorney David Andrew Nicholas added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla) (Nicholas, David)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/14/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/14/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1342-RM (angar, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Levine, Neil)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, High Country Conservation Advocates, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians (Levine, Neil)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7291686)Attorney Neil Levine added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Neil Levine added to party High Country Conservation Advocates(pty:pla), Attorney Neil Levine added to party Sierra Club(pty:pla), Attorney Neil Levine added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians, High Country Conservation Advocates, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Levine, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians et al v. Mountain Coal Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Coal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Country Conservation Advocates
Represented By: Neil Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Neil Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Neil Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Neil Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?