Ratzmann v. Los Pinos Fire Protection District, The et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Ratzmann
Defendant: Mark Williams, Los Pinos Fire Protection District, The, Paul Blocker, James Brown, Frank Weis, Kirk Becker, Paul (I) Blocker, Mark (I) Williams, Kirk (I) Becker, James (I) Brown, Frank (I) Weis and Los Pinos Fire Protection District
Case Number: 1:2020cv01599
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01599-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Kirk Becker, Paul Blocker, James Brown, Los Pinos Fire Protection District, Frank Weis, Mark Williams All parties do not consent.. (Harpole, Jennifer)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Cohee Freemann on behalf of Kirk Becker, Paul Blocker, James Brown, Los Pinos Fire Protection District, Frank Weis, Mark WilliamsAttorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party Kirk Becker(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party Paul Blocker(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party James Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party Los Pinos Fire Protection District(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party Frank Weis(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party Mark Williams(pty:dft) (Freemann, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Ratzmann. Mark Williams waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Albrechta, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Ratzmann. Frank Weis waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Albrechta, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Ratzmann. James Brown waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Albrechta, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Ratzmann. Paul Blocker waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Albrechta, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Ratzmann. Kirk Becker waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Albrechta, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Ratzmann. Los Pinos Fire Protection District waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Albrechta, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jennifer S. Harpole by Jennifer S. Harpole on behalf of Kirk Becker, Paul Blocker, James Brown, Los Pinos Fire Protection District, Frank Weis, Mark WilliamsAttorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Kirk Becker(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Paul Blocker(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party James Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Los Pinos Fire Protection District(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Frank Weis(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Mark Williams(pty:dft) (Harpole, Jennifer)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Tyler Albrechta on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Tyler Albrechta added to party Kevin Ratzmann(pty:pla) (Albrechta, David)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/15/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 7/30/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/6/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/13/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (cmadr, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Kirk Becker, Paul Blocker, James Brown, Los Pinos Fire Protection District, The, Frank Weis, Mark Williams (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7324054)Attorney Eleni Kennebeck Albrechta added to party Kevin Ratzmann(pty:pla), filed by Kevin Ratzmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albrechta, Eleni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratzmann v. Los Pinos Fire Protection District, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Williams
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Pinos Fire Protection District, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Blocker
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Weis
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Becker
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul (I) Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark (I) Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk (I) Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank (I) Weis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Pinos Fire Protection District
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ratzmann
Represented By: Eleni Kennebeck Albrechta
Represented By: David Tyler Albrechta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?