Shabazz v. Parole Board et al
Petitioner: Ali Shabazz
Respondent: Parole Board
Case Number: 1:2020cv02001
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 8/18/2020. (sphil, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28U.S.C. 2241 (ECF No. 1) is DENIED and the action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to cure the deficiencies and failure to prosecute. IFP on appeal is DENIED. No certificate of appealability will issue, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/18/2020. (sphil, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Applicant, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy of the form Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/09/2020. (athom, ) (form mailed as ordered)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Ali Shabazz.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shabazz v. Parole Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ali Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?