Said v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: MUTAZ MUHAMMAD SAID
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf, Mary Mischke, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Christopher Wray
Case Number: 1:2020cv02316
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02316-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Mutaz Muhammad Said All parties do not consent.. (Hacking, James)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander J. Halaska on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Alexander J. Halaska added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander J. Halaska added to party Mary Mischke(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander J. Halaska added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander J. Halaska added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander J. Halaska added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander J. Halaska added to party Christopher Wray(pty:dft) (Halaska, Alexander)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/9/2020. Due to an unavoidable scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 3:00 PM is hereby RESET in time only to 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Mary Mischke, Chad Wolf, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher Wray, United States Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. Mary Mischke answer due 10/29/2020; Chad Wolf answer due 10/29/2020; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 10/29/2020; Christopher Wray answer due 10/29/2020; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 10/29/2020; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli answer due 10/29/2020. (Prose, Susan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan Begesse Prose on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Susan Begesse Prose added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Begesse Prose added to party Mary Mischke(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Begesse Prose added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Begesse Prose added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Begesse Prose added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Begesse Prose added to party Christopher Wray(pty:dft) (Prose, Susan)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/23/2020, granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Consent Form due by 10/26/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/2/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference RESET for 11/9/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976 to participate at the designated time. In addition, Plaintiff is reminded of this court's conferral requirements. See NYW Civ. Practice Standard 7.1. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Planning Conference by Plaintiff Mutaz Muhammad Said. (Hacking, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/6/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 9/29/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/6/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/13/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mary Mischke and Christopher Wray re #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Mutaz Muhammad Said. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hacking, James)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mary Mischke, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, Christopher Wray, filed by Mutaz Muhammad Said.(Hacking, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. All defendants must be listed in each summons caption. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mary Mischke, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf, Christopher Wray (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7421786)Attorney James O. Hacking, III added to party MUTAZ MUHAMMAD SAID(pty:pla), filed by MUTAZ MUHAMMAD SAID. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Said v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Alexander J. Halaska
Represented By: Susan Begesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Alexander J. Halaska
Represented By: Susan Begesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Alexander J. Halaska
Represented By: Susan Begesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mischke
Represented By: Alexander J. Halaska
Represented By: Susan Begesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Alexander J. Halaska
Represented By: Susan Begesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Alexander J. Halaska
Represented By: Susan Begesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUTAZ MUHAMMAD SAID
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?