Garrett v. Roark et al
Petitioner: Anthony Garrett
Respondent: Roark and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv02502
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Petitioner Anthony Garrett (evana, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 RECEIPT for Green card certified mail to Bent County Correctional Facility for Order to Answer re: #8 Certificate of Service (evana, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service on 10/5/2020 re: Order to File Pre-Answer Response on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The (evana, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #7 Order, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipt) (jsalz, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/1/2020) (jsalz, ).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE within thirty (30) days from the date of this order Respondents shall file a pre-answer response that complies with this order. That within thirty (30) days of the filing of the pre-answer response Petitioner may file a reply, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/30/2020. (evana, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Anthony Garrett (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (evana, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX096334 (apesa, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner must pay the full $5.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days from the date of this order if he wishes to pursue the 2254 claims inthis action. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Petitioner fails to pay the $5.00 filing fee within the time allowed, the habeas corpus application will be denied and the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/21/2020.(apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action. by Petitioner Anthony Garrett. (trvo, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Anthony Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Letter Regarding Filing Fee, #2 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Roark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?