Alemar v. Reichert et al
Plaintiff: Jose Alemar
Defendant: Tabzte, Bryan Reichert and Tabata
Case Number: 1:2020cv02855
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Jose Alemar. (rvill, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER by Plaintiff Jose Alemar. (rvill, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 Emergency Update by Plaintiff Jose Alemar (rvill, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDMENT by Plaintiff Jose Alemar. (rvill, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 15, 2020. Plaintiff has complied with the September 22, 2020, Order to Cure Deficiencies in part by submitting his claims on a current Court-approved form used in filing prisoner complaints. He, however, has failed to submit the proper Court-approved form used in filing a request to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a prisoner complaint. The Clerk of the Court, therefore, is directed to send to Plaintiff the current Court-approved Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 form. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order to submit the proper Motion and Affidavit as identified above. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed the action will be dismissed without further notice. (Form mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Plaintiff Jose Alemar. (rvill, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Bryan Reichert, Tabzte, filed by Jose Alemar. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(rvill, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER re: Medical Emergency by Plaintiff Jose Alemar. (rvill, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 22, 2020. (rvill, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 Medical Emergency Injunction, against Bryan Reichert, Tabzte filed by Jose Alemar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Envelope)(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alemar v. Reichert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabzte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alemar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?