Estate of April Blackmon-Logan et al v. Adams County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Estate of April Blackmon-Logan and Christopher Miserlian
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Office, Adams County Sheriff Deputy Chad Jenkins, Adams County Sheriff Richard Reigenborn, Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado Department of Transportation, Kalcevic Land Company, Leah Ford, Estate of Leah Ford, Michael Linnebur, Phillip Trujillo, Seven T. Farms, Adams County Sheriff's Office, The, Chad Jenkins, Chad (I) Jenkins, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn, Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado and Seven T. Farms LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02021
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 September 2021. For good cause shown, Defendant The Estate of Leah Ford's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #24 is granted. The Estate shall file its answer or other response to the current operative pleading on or before October 4, 2021.(cmadr, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/20/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
September 20, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Leah Ford. (Bryan, Christopher)
September 16, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Adams County Sheriff's Office, The, Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado, Chad Jenkins, Chad (I) Jenkins, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn.(Booth, Kerri)
September 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hillary Ryan Ross on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Hillary Ryan Ross added to party Estate of April Blackmon-Logan(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Ryan Ross added to party Christopher Miserlian(pty:pla) (Ross, Hillary)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for the Adams County Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 9/16/2021. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/02/2021. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Chad (I) Jenkins, Chad Jenkins, Richard Reigenborn, Adams County Sheriff's Office, The, Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado, Richard (I) Reigenborn. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/02/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
September 2, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Adams County Sheriff's Office, The, Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado, Chad Jenkins, Chad (I) Jenkins, Richard Reigenborn, Richard (I) Reigenborn. (Booth, Kerri)
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 Defendant Seven T. Farms, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Jury Demand Attorney Jack David Robinson added to party Seven T. Farms LLC(pty:dft) by Seven T. Farms LLC.(Robinson, Jack)
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Michael Linnebur.(Shurtleff, Lance)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 August 2021. For good cause shown, Defendant The Estate of Leah Ford's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #14 is granted. The Estate shall file its answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before September 20, 2021.(cmadr, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, filed by Leah Ford. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/30/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Leah Ford. (Bryan, Christopher)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 August 2021. For good cause shown, Defendant Michael Linnebur's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand #11 is granted. Defendant Linnebur shall file his answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before August 31, 2021.(cmadr, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, filed by Michael Linnebur. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/25/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Michael Linnebur. (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Kalcevic Land Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Jury Demand by Kalcevic Land Company.(Chaney, Lelia)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lance E. Shurtleff on behalf of Michael LinneburAttorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Michael Linnebur(pty:dft) (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lelia Kathleen Chaney on behalf of Kalcevic Land CompanyAttorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Kalcevic Land Company(pty:dft) (Chaney, Lelia)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The Adams County Sheriff's Office; Adams County Sheriff's Deputy Chad Jenkins; Adams County Sheriff Richard Reigenborn; Board of County Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado; Kalcevic Land Company; Seven T. Farms; Phillip Trujillo; Colorado Department of Transportation; Leah Ford individually, by and though the Estate of Leah Ford; and, Michael Linnebur re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Estate of April Blackmon-Logan. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Bovo, Paula)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2021. Scheduling Conference on November 2, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (agarc, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. The summons must name all parties. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cpomm, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams County Sheriff Deputy Chad Jenkins, Adams County Sheriff Richard Reigenborn, Adams County Sheriff's Office, Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado Department of Transportation, Estate of Leah Ford, Leah Ford, Kalcevic Land Company, Michael Linnebur, Seven T. Farms, Phillip Trujillo (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7977572)Attorney Paula Georgia Bovo added to party Estate of April Blackmon-Logan(pty:pla), filed by Estate of April Blackmon-Logan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Bovo, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of April Blackmon-Logan et al v. Adams County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of April Blackmon-Logan
Represented By: Paula Georgia Bovo
Represented By: Hillary Ryan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miserlian
Represented By: Hillary Ryan Ross
Represented By: Paula Georgia Bovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff Deputy Chad Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff Richard Reigenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of County of Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalcevic Land Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Ford
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Leah Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Linnebur
Represented By: Lance E. Shurtleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven T. Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Office, The
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Jenkins
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad (I) Jenkins
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Reigenborn
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard (I) Reigenborn
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of County of Adams, Colorado
Represented By: Kerri Ann Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven T. Farms LLC
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?