Elliott v. Jeffreson County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Kenneth Elliott
Defendant: Jeffreson County Detention Center, Jeffrey Schneider, Reardon, Martinez, Mayer, Leiden, Cruz, Travis, Leyman and Grey
Case Number: 1:2021cv02358
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Kenneth Elliott in the amount of $33.00. Receipt Number COX100914; Initial Payment. (trvo, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint that provides a short and plain statement of each claim he is asserting as discussed in this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/20/2021. (trvo, ) (mailed as ordered)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grey, Leyman, Reardon, Travis, Cruz, Martinez, Leiden, Mayer, Unnamed Mental Health Staff, Jeffrey Schneider filed by Kenneth Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trvo, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Elliott. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 28, 2021, to file an amended complaint as previously directed. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/1/2021.(trvo, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Kenneth Elliott. (trvo, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within 30 days from the date of this Order, an amended complaint on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/8/2021. (trvo, ) (mailed as ordered)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. It is ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Appointment of Counsel in a Criminal Case (ECF No. #3 ) is denied as premature. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/1/2021.(trvo, ) (mailed as ordered)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel in a Criminal Case. by Plaintiff Kenneth Elliott. (norlin, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Kenneth Elliott. (norlin, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Jeffreson County Detention Center, filed by Kenneth Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope)(norlin, ) Modified to correct file date on 9/1/2021 (norlin, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Jeffreson County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffreson County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?