Hale-El v. Boulder County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Colby Jerome Hale-El
Defendant: Boulder County Jail, Metcalf, Jarboe, Joe Pelle and Sheriff Joe Pelle
Case Number: 1:2022cv03099
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the Court's Prisoner Complaint form. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint by February 20, 2023, this action may be dismissed, in whole or in part, without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/20/2023. [Form mailed as Ordered] (sdunb, )
January 19, 2023 Filing 17 LETTER by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 Exhibit RR by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
January 9, 2023 Filing 15 Moorish American Consular Court, Competent Jurisdiction Pursuant to P.L. 8 Stat. 484 by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El (sdunb, )
January 9, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boulder County Jail, Jarboe, Metcalf, Joe Pelle, filed by Colby Jerome Hale-El.(sdunb, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 13 Writ of Discovery/Averment of Jurisdiction-Quo Warranto & Default Notice, filed by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/5/2023. (jtorr, )
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 Exhibits by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/3/2023. (Copy sent to Boulder County Jail as ordered.)(jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE Pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 1001 by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 1001 by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El (sphil, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 7 Exhibits by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 Exhibits by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Colby Jerome Hale-El. (jtorr, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Boulder County Jail, Jarboe, Metcalf, Joe Pelle, filed by Colby Jerome Hale-El.(jtorr, )
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/01/2022. (Forms mailed as ordered.) (jtorr, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 HOSTAGE COMPLAINT against Boulder County Jail, Jarboe, Metcalf, Joe Pelle, filed by Colby Jerome Hale-El. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jcharl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale-El v. Boulder County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Jerome Hale-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Pelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joe Pelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?