Pittman v. Long et al
Plaintiff: Emanuel Pittman
Defendant: Jeff Long, Roland Jackson, Landee Zanotelli, Vickie Nira, Mitchell, Weaver, Colo Springs Management, Dean Willams, Orin, Barnes, Willey, Vasquez, Joy Hart, Griffith, Pappas, Michele Rios, Andrew Thore, Zanelli, Dean Williams, Marshall Griffith and Dorsey
Case Number: 1:2023cv00291
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher as a United States District Judge, and with the permission of Chief Judge Brimmer pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), this action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00291-KLM. (Text only entry) (nmilt)
February 17, 2023 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Barnes, Colo Springs Management, Marshall Griffith, Joy Hart, Roland Jackson, Jeff Long, Mitchell, Vickie Nira, Orin, Pappas, Michele Rios, Andrew Thore, Vasquez, Weaver, Dean Willams, Willey, Zanelli, Landee Zanotelli, filed by Emanuel Pittman.(sdunb, )
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Emanuel Pittman in the amount of $ 16.67; Receipt Number 105998. (sdunb, )
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT. If Mr. Pittman fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, some or all of this action may be dismissed without further notice for the reasons discussed above. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/7/2023. (jtorr, )
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/6/2023. [Copy emailed to DOC Inmate Accounts] (sdunb, )
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Emanuel Pittman. (sdunb, )
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/2/2023. (sdunb, )
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Barnes, Colo Springs Management, Griffith, Joy Hart, Roland Jackson, Jeff Long, Mitchell, Vickie Nira, Orin, Pappas, Michele Rios, Andrew Thore, Vasquez, Weaver, Dean Willams, Willey, Zanelli, Landee Zanotelli, filed by Emanuel Pittman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(norlin, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landee Zanotelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Nira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colo Springs Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Willams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Thore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?