Lucero v. Goldsmidt et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Lucero
Defendant: William Goldsmidt and DoorDash, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00460
Filed: February 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/6/2023. (morti, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 29 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/6/2023. Discovery due by 1/31/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2024. Due to the recent reassignment of this case to Judge Gordon P. Gallagher upon his appointment as a U.S. District Judge, the parties shall jointly email Judge Gallaghers chambers within 24 hours to obtain dates for a Final Pretrial Conference, Trial Preparation Conference and Trial dates. FTR: A402. (morti, )
April 5, 2023 Filing 28 REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge Gordon P. Gallagher upon his appointment as United States District Judge. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained. Judge Gallagher is located in Courtroom 323 in the Wayne Aspinall Courthouse. His telephone number is (970) 241-8932. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00460-GPG-STV. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
March 30, 2023 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant DoorDash, Inc.. (Uduebor, Valentine)
March 27, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tessa Frances Carberry on behalf of William GoldsmidtAttorney Tessa Frances Carberry added to party William Goldsmidt(pty:dft) (Carberry, Tessa)
March 21, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Valentine Uduebor by Valentine Uduebor on behalf of DoorDash, Inc.Attorney Valentine Uduebor added to party DoorDash, Inc.(pty:dft) (Uduebor, Valentine)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/16/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
March 16, 2023 Filing 23 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #22 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00460-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 16, 2023 Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant William Goldsmidt All parties do not consent.. (DeVerna, Ashley)
March 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley J. DeVerna on behalf of William Goldsmidt (DeVerna, Ashley)
March 8, 2023 Filing 20 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Ashley Jean DeVerna failed to pay the 2022 Biennial Fee. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a) and District Court General Order 2022-7, counsel was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll. Counsel must submit another bar application though PACER, pay the application fee, and, upon reinstatement, file a Notice of Entry of Appearance to continue as counsel of record in this case. Please visit and fully review the 2022 Biennial Renewal Fee page before contacting the court for assistance: #Biennial / Renewal Fee Information | US District Court of Colorado (uscourts.gov). (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
March 6, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant DoorDash, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet Arapahoe County District Court Case No. 2023CV030088)(Knight, Linda)
February 24, 2023 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ridley, Terence)
February 24, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by DoorDash, Inc..(Knight, Linda)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2023 in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is RESET to 10:45 AM. This change is to TIME ONLY, the date/location of the Scheduling Conference remain the same. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/23/2023. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 23 February 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/30/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2023 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 14 Defendant William Goldsmidt's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by William Goldsmidt.(Collier, Jessica)
February 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Jean DeVerna on behalf of William GoldsmidtAttorney Ashley Jean DeVerna added to party William Goldsmidt(pty:dft) (DeVerna, Ashley)
February 22, 2023 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
February 22, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00460-STV. (athom, )
February 19, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah A. Schreiber on behalf of Tammy LuceroAttorney Sarah A. Schreiber added to party Tammy Lucero(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Sarah)
February 17, 2023 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant Doordash, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for A 14-Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Ben L Leutwyler III on 01/31/2023. (jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim or Third Party Complaint and Jury Demand, and Summons upon William Goldsmidt on 01/24/2023. (jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim or Third Party Complaint and Jury Demand, and Summons upon DoorDash, Inc. on 01/19/2023. (jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against DoorDash, Inc., William Goldsmidt, filed by Tammy Lucero.(jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
February 17, 2023 Filing 2 JOINDER in Defendant DoorDash, Inc.'s Notice of Removal by Defendant William Goldsmidt. (Collier, Jessica)
February 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DoorDash, Inc. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2023CV30088. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8944719), filed by DoorDash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 State Court - Affidavit of Service on DoorDash, Inc. on 01/19/2023, #4 State Court - Affidavit of Service on Goldsmidt on 01/24/2023, #5 State Court - Order Granting DoorDash Until 02/23/2023 to respond to Complaint, #6 State Court - Entry of Appearance of Ashley DeVerna on behalf of Goldsmidt, #7 State Court - Entry of Appearance of Jessica Collier on behalf of Goldsmidt, #8 State Court - Entry of Appearance of Tessa F. Carberry on behalf of Goldsmidt, #9 State Court - Summons to DoorDash, #10 State Court - Summons to Goldsmidt, #11 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #12 State Court - Division 15 Delay Reduction Order and Order Re Plan for Settlement, #13 State Court - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Goldsmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lucero
Represented By: Sarah A. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Goldsmidt
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Represented By: Ashley J. DeVerna
Represented By: Tessa Frances Carberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DoorDash, Inc.
Represented By: Linda J. Knight
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Valentine Uduebor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?