Payne v. Becton, Dickinson and Co., et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Payne
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson and Co., C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Access Systems
Case Number: 1:2023cv01669
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona at InterdistrictTransfer_AZD@azd.uscourts.gov to become a part of MDL No. 3081. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
August 18, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-1 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from District of Colorado, 23-cv-01669-PAB-SKC, to District of Arizona to become part of MDL No. 3081, by Clerk on 8/18/2023. (sphil, )
July 27, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (jtorr, )
July 26, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to C.R. Bard, Inc. by Plaintiff Jessica Payne. (Leger, Bradley)
July 26, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Becton, Dickinson and Company by Plaintiff Jessica Payne. (Leger, Bradley)
July 26, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Bard Access Systems, Inc. by Plaintiff Jessica Payne. (Leger, Bradley)
July 26, 2023 Filing 11 Administrative Notice re: Summons Requests (ECF Nos. #8 , #9 , and #10 ). Summonses submitted have incorrect caption and are not issued. Each summons caption must list all parties. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event "Summons Request." (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to C.R. Bard, Inc. by Plaintiff Jessica Payne. (Leger, Bradley)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Becton, Dickinson and Company by Plaintiff Jessica Payne. (Leger, Bradley)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Bard Access Systems, Inc. by Plaintiff Jessica Payne. (Leger, Bradley)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #6 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneys Bradley L. Leger and Rodney K. Castille. The s/signature did not match the filer's name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of RODNEY K. CASTILLE by Bradley Landon Leger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leger, Bradley)
July 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of BRADLEY L. LEGER by Bradley Landon Leger on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Bradley Landon Leger added to party Jessica Payne(pty:pla) (Leger, Bradley)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/18/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (norlin, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9175743)Attorney Bradly J. Holmes added to party Jessica Payne(pty:pla), filed by Jessica Payne.(Holmes, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Becton, Dickinson and Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Payne
Represented By: Bradly J. Holmes
Represented By: Rodney K. Castille
Represented By: Bradley Landon Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Access Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?