Serna et al v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Serna and Ajhalei Snoddy
Defendant: Anne Turner, FHWA, Eric Bentley, Dominguez Braswell and Holmes
Case Number: 1:2023cv02579
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
2 Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Anne Turner; and #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eric Bentley.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/1/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Francisco Serna, Ajhalei Snoddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cmadr, )
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to #10 Motion to Dismiss is extended up to and through 12/21/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/29/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc8, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time 21 Days to Respond to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Francisco Serna, Ajhalei Snoddy. (cmadr, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE to Court Regarding Defendant Turner's Service Date, Docket #9 , filed by Plaintiffs Francisco Serna, Ajhalei Snoddy. (jtorr, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Eric Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Trial Management Order)(Buckley, Emily)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Anne Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1_ExhibitsList, #2 Exhibit Exh 2_17CV31927_PetitionInCondemnation, #3 Exhibit Exh 3_ 21-cv-939-DII_FirstAmendmentToPetition, #4 Exhibit Exh 4_21-cv-03444_NoticeOfRemoval, #5 Exhibit Exh 5_22-cv-02998_ThirdAmendedComplaint, #6 Exhibit Exh 6_23-cv-00728_AmendedComplaint, #7 Exhibit Exh 7_23CV000314_PetitionUnderCRCP106, #8 Exhibit Exh 8_23-cv-02579_Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exh 9_23CA1710_NoticeOfAppeal, #10 Exhibit Exh 10_2017CV31927_FinalJudgment)(Doherty, Ryan)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/10/2023. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall take steps necessary to have this case reassigned to a district judge outside of the District of Colorado. (jtorr, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to #6 Order of Recusal This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella in the referral role only. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02579-DDD-KAS. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. It is ORDERED that I RECUSE myself from this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall cause this case to be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 10/04/2023. (jcharl, )
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/3/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 This case was assigned incorrectly. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, the case has been directly reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02579-DDD. (Text only entry) (blaws)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued over-the-counter by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Bentley, Dominguez Braswell, FHWA, Holmes, Anne Turner (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: 108405), filed by Francisco Serna, Ajhalei Snoddy. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Summons) (blaws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serna et al v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajhalei Snoddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Turner
Represented By: Ryan Douglas Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FHWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bentley
Represented By: Emily B. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominguez Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?