D.B.U. et al v. Trump et al
Petitioner: D.B.U. and R.M.M.
Respondent: Donald J. Trump, Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, US Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Marco Rubio, US State Department, Robert Gaudian and Dawn Ceja
Case Number: 1:2025cv01163
Filed: April 12, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2241 in - Habeas Corpus: INS
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Thomas Traskos on behalf of Dawn Ceja, Donald J. Trump, Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, US Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Marco Rubio, US State Department, Robert GaudianAttorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Dawn Ceja(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Pamela Bondi(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Kristi Noem(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Todd Lyons(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Marco Rubio(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party US State Department(pty:res), Attorney Kevin Thomas Traskos added to party Robert Gaudian(pty:res) (Traskos, Kevin)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service Pursuant to Court Order (ECF 10) of Court Filings and Order upon Respondents on 4/14/2025, filed by Petitioners D.B.U., R.M.M. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Email String, #2 Exhibit B, Service Tracking and Receipt)(Neel, Sara)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Emergency Motion to Clarify. Upon review of Petitioners' emergency motion to clarify, ECF No. 13, the motion is GRANTED. The order issued by the Court at ECF No. 10 prohibits the removal from this jurisdiction of Petitioners and the class they propose to represent; namely, "All noncitizens in custody in the District of Colorado who were, are, or will be subject to the March 2025 Presidential Proclamation entitled Invocation of the Alien Enemies Act Regarding the Invasion of the United States by Tren de Aragua and/or its implementation." This order shall remain in effect for no longer than fourteen (14) days, as the Court has set a hearing on this matter for April 21, 2025, and will promptly issue an order as to the motion for a TRO. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/14/2025. Text Only Entry(cnsja, )
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Emergency MOTION to Clarify by Petitioners D.B.U., R.M.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Macdonald, Timothy)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna I. Kurtz on behalf of D.B.U., R.M.M. Attorney Anna I. Kurtz added to party D.B.U. (pty:pet), Attorney Anna I. Kurtz added to party R.M.M. (pty:pet) (Kurtz, Anna)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/14/2025.(cnsja, )
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Petitioners'-Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (TRO). ECF No. #2 . Pursuant to the All Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. 1651(a), and in order to preserve the Court's jurisdiction, Defendants SHALL NOT REMOVE Petitioners from the District of Colorado or the United States unless or until this Court or the Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit vacates this Order. See also Vizguerra-Ramirez v. Choate, et. al, Case No. 1:25-cv-881, D. Colo., ECF No. 11 at 4-5 (collecting cases); F.T.C. v. Dean Foods Co., 384 U.S. 597, 603 (1966); Local 1814, Int'l Longshoremen's Ass'n v. New York Shipping Ass'n, 965 F.2d 1224, 1237 (2d Cir. 1992). To the extent they have not yet done so, no later than today, April 14, 2025, Petitioners' counsel is directed (1) to serve Respondents with a copy of the TRO motion and accompanying papers, along with a copy of this Order, by e-mail to the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Colorado and by overnight mail; and (2) to promptly file proof of such service on the docket. Counsel for Defendants shall promptly enter notices of appearance. Defendants are further ordered to RESPOND to Petitioners' TRO motion by THURSDAY, April 17, 2025. See, e.g., Gurchiani v. Garland, No. 23-9588, 2025 WL 46446, at *5 n.11 (10th Cir. Jan. 8, 2025) (noting "importance of adversarial briefing"). The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a hearing on Petitioners' TRO motion on Monday, April 21, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A702 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/14/2025. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons not issued for Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (agarc, )
April 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emma K. Mclean-Riggs on behalf of D.B.U., R.M.M. Attorney Emma K. Mclean-Riggs added to party D.B.U. (pty:pet), Attorney Emma K. Mclean-Riggs added to party R.M.M. (pty:pet) (Mclean-Riggs, Emma)
April 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy R. Macdonald on behalf of R.M.M. Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party R.M.M. (pty:pet) (Macdonald, Timothy)
April 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy R. Macdonald on behalf of D.B.U. Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party D.B.U. (pty:pet) (Macdonald, Timothy)
April 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Text Only Entry (jcolw, )
April 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class by Petitioners D.B.U., R.M.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Galindo Declaration)(Neel, Sara)
April 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Petitioners D.B.U., R.M.M.. (Neel, Sara)
April 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Petitioners D.B.U., R.M.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Barber Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, Hightower Declaration, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Neel, Sara)
April 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 and Class Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number ACODC-10274533)Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party D.B.U. (pty:pet), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party R.M.M. (pty:pet), filed by D.B.U., R.M.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Neel, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.B.U. et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D.B.U.
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Emma K. Mclean-Riggs
Represented By: Anna I. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R.M.M.
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Emma K. Mclean-Riggs
Represented By: Anna I. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pamela Bondi
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristi Noem
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marco Rubio
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US State Department
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Gaudian
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dawn Ceja
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?