Doe 1 et al v. Ciolli et al Featured Case

Two female Yale Law School students sued because defendants posted defamatory and threatening comments about them on an online forum at AutoAdmit.com.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: Doe 1 and Doe 2
Defendant: t14 gunner, kr0nz, reminderdood, Sleazy Z, Whamo (Let me lay it on the line, he had two on the vine), leaf, Remember when I said I would kill you last? I lied, Todd Christopher, lonelyvirgin, Patrick Zeke, Ari Gold, AK47, Whamo, vincimus, Patrick Bateman, Prof. Brian Leiter, hitlerhitlerhitler, who is, Joel Schellhammer, r@ygold, Cheese Eating Surrender Monkey, azn, azn, azn, Dirty Nigger, :D, :D (Hillary vs. Jeb '08), MoreDoughHi, [DOE 1] got a 157 LSAT, ylsdooder, Community Norm, HI, David Car (Glass of water for Mr. Grainger), Get_to_da_choppa, Dean_Harold_Koh, Ugly Women, playboytroll, kibitzer, yalels2009, The Ayatollah of Rock-n-Rollah, DRACULA, lkjhgf, yalelaw, Anthony Ciolli, Pauliewalnuts, neoprag, STANFORDtroll, Spanky, Beach Body Brady, David Carr, A horse walks into a bar and A horse walks into a bar (saving one CPGWBT at a time)
Case Number: 3:2007cv00909
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Christopher F. Droney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2009 111 AO 121 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Case) (Grady, B.)
October 23, 2009 110 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE in accordance with stipulation of dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/23/09. (Droney, Christopher)
October 16, 2009 109 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Against Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Berkowitz, Benjamin)
September 30, 2009 108 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE against Defendant Matthew C. Ryan. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/30/09. (Droney, Christopher)
September 29, 2009 107 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action Against Defendant ":D", A.K.A. Matthew C. Ryan by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Berkowitz, Benjamin)
July 9, 2009 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Lemley on behalf of Doe 1 and Doe 2 (Lemley, Mark) (Grady, B.).
June 26, 2009 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/30/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2009 Trial Ready Date 2/1/2010 (Johnson, D.)
June 26, 2009 105 Featured Case ORDER, Approved and So Ordered, 104 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 6/26/09. (Szczygiel, G.)
June 24, 2009 104 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. [CORRECTION to entry 103](Bauer, J.)
June 24, 2009 103 ENTERED IN ERROR: Joint STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Matthew C. Ryan, Doe 1, Doe 2. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) Modified on 6/25/2009 (Bauer, J.).
June 16, 2009 Set Deadline: Status Report due by 6/25/2009 (Grady, B.)
June 16, 2009 102 Featured Case ORDER requiring counsel to file a status report by June 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 6/16/09. (Droney, Christopher)
May 21, 2009 101 ANSWER to 51 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses. by Matthew C. Ryan.(Fortner, Joseph)
April 30, 2009 100 Ruling denying 77 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 04/30/09. (Grady, B.)
March 6, 2009 99 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: taking under advisement 77 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2009 re 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Matthew C. Ryan. 45 minutes(Court Reporter M. Marshall.) (Johnson, D.)
February 27, 2009 98 RESPONSE re 97 Notice of Additional Authority filed by Matthew C. Ryan. (Fortner, Joseph)
February 18, 2009 97 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by Doe 1, Doe 2 re 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Berkowitz, Benjamin)
January 30, 2009 96 Featured Case ORDER approving and ordering stipulation of dismissal as to that defendant[doc. # 94]. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 1/30/09. (Droney, Christopher)
January 30, 2009 95 Featured Case ORDER denying 59 Motion to Dismiss in light of stipulation of dismissal as to this defendant. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 1/30/09. (Droney, Christopher)
January 29, 2009 94 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action Against Defendant "A Horse Walk Into A Bar," A.K.A Ryan Mariner by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Ramani, Ashok)
January 26, 2009 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dorothy McLaughlin and Steven Mitra terminated. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 1/26/09. (Droney, Christopher)
January 23, 2009 92 Featured Case ORDER, Approved and So Ordered, 90 Notice of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action against defendant "pauliewalnuts" by Doe 1, Doe 2. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 1/23/09. (Szczygiel, G.)
January 21, 2009 91 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTIONS TO DISMISS [Dkt. #s 59 & 77 ] is set for 3/6/09 at 2:00 PM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. The parties will each have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION.(Szczygiel, G.)
January 21, 2009 90 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action Against Defendant "pauliewalnuts" by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Ramani, Ashok)
December 8, 2008 89 RESPONSE re 85 Memorandum in Opposition to 77 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Matthew C. Ryan. (Fortner, Joseph) Modified on 12/9/2008 for linkage to motion (Grady, B.).
December 1, 2008 88 Docket Entry Correction: Document 86 Affidavit has been modified to add the certificate of service. (Grady, B.)
November 26, 2008 87 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Doe 1, Doe 2 re 86 Affidavit (Berkowitz, Benjamin) Modified on 12/1/2008 (Grady, B.).
November 25, 2008 86 AFFIDAVIT of Benjamin Berkowitz. Signed By Benjamin Berkowitz filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) Modified on 11/26/2008 to correct text (Grady, B.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2008: # 2 Certificate of Service) (Grady, B.).
November 25, 2008 85 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Support of Opposition to Matthew Ryan's Motion to Dismiss re 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) Modified on 11/26/2008 to correct text (Grady, B.).
November 21, 2008 84 STATUS REPORT by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Lemley, Mark)
November 21, 2008 83 STATUS REPORT by A horse walks into a bar. (Vermette, Charles)
November 19, 2008 82 Featured Case ORDER, Approving 81 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action Against Defendant "Vincimus". Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 11/19/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
November 17, 2008 81 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action Against Defendant "Vincimus" by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Ramani, Ashok)
November 7, 2008 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/21/2008 (Johnson, D.)
November 7, 2008 80 Featured Case ORDER directing counsel to file a status report by November 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 11/7/08. (Droney, Christopher)
November 6, 2008 79 AFFIDAVIT re 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed By Joseph G. Fortner, Jr. filed by Matthew C. Ryan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fortner, Joseph)
November 6, 2008 78 Memorandum in Support re 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Matthew C. Ryan. (Fortner, Joseph)
November 6, 2008 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Matthew C. Ryan.Responses due by 11/27/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fortner, Joseph)
October 17, 2008 76 Featured Case ORDER, Approved and So Ordered, 75 Notice of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action against defendant "Whamo". Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/17/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
October 16, 2008 75 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of Action Against Defendant "Whamo" by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Ramani, Ashok)
October 6, 2008 74 Featured Case ORDER Granting 73 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 7, 2008 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/6/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
October 2, 2008 73 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 7, 2008 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Amended Complaint 51 Amended Complaint by Matthew C. Ryan. (O'Donnell, Susan)
September 12, 2008 Answer deadline updated for Matthew C. Ryan to 10/8/2008. (Grady, B.)
September 12, 2008 72 Featured Case ORDER Granting 69 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2008 to answer or otherwise plead 51 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/12/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
September 10, 2008 71 AFFIDAVIT re 70 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 59 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) or in the alternative for failure to prosecute, [RE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO A HORSE WALKS INTO A BARS A.K.A. RYAN MARINERS MOTION TO DISMISS] Signed By ROSE DARLING filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
September 10, 2008 70 Memorandum in Opposition TO A HORSE WALKS INTO A BARS A.K.A. RYAN MARINERS MOTION TO DISMISS, re: 59 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (B)(6) or in the alternative for failure to prosecute filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
September 8, 2008 69 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2008 to answer or otherwise plead 51 Amended Complaint by Matthew C. Ryan. (O'Donnell, Susan)
September 2, 2008 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan J. O'Donnell on behalf of Matthew C. Ryan (O'Donnell, Susan)
September 2, 2008 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Fortner, Jr on behalf of Matthew C. Ryan (Fortner, Joseph)
September 2, 2008 66 Featured Case ORDER Granting 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until September 10, 2008 file and serve Opposition to Mariner's Motion To Dismiss 59 Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) or in the alternative for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/2/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
September 2, 2008 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Doe 1, Doe 2 (Ramani, Ashok)
September 2, 2008 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until September 10, 2008 file and serve Opposition to Mariner's Motion To Dismiss 59 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) or in the alternative for failure to prosecute by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
August 18, 2008 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 MOTION to admit Attorney Orlando P. Ojeda, Jr. pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/08. (Grady, B.)
August 18, 2008 62 MOTION to admit Attorney Orlando P. Ojeda, Jr. pro hac vice. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number H026273 by A horse walks into a bar. (Grady, B.)
August 15, 2008 61 Docket Entry Correction: Document 51 Second Amended Complaint has been modified to replace the PDF. (Grady, B.)
August 13, 2008 60 Memorandum in Support re 59 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) or in the alternative for failure to prosecute filed by A horse walks into a bar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Collins, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Vermette, Charles) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
August 13, 2008 59 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) or in the alternative for failure to prosecute by A horse walks into a bar. Responses due by 9/3/2008 (Vermette, Charles) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
August 13, 2008 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 MOTION to admit Attorney Daniel J. Hoppe, Jr. pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/08. (Grady, B.)
August 13, 2008 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 MOTION to Attorney W. Anthony Collins, Jr. pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/08. (Grady, B.)
August 13, 2008 Docket Entry Correction: Document 53 Order on Pretrial Deadlines was entered in this case in error. (Grady, B.)
August 11, 2008 56 MOTION to admit Attorney Daniel J. Hoppe, Jr. pro hac vice. Filing Fee $25.00, Receipt Number N025284 by A horse walks into a bar. (Grady, B.)
August 11, 2008 55 MOTION to Attorney W. Anthony Collins, Jr. pro hac vice. Filing Fee $25.00, Receipt Number N025284 by A horse walks into a bar. (Grady, B.)
August 11, 2008 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Vermette, Jr on behalf of A horse walks into a bar (Grady, B.)
August 8, 2008 53 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/08/08. Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2008; Discovery due by 2/7/2009; Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2009. Signed by Clerk on 08/08/08. (Grady, B.) Modified on 8/8/2008 (Grady, B.).
August 8, 2008 52 Docket Entry Correction: Document 51 Amended Complaint [SECOND] has been modified to replace the Second Amended Complaint. (Grady, B.)
August 6, 2008 Summons Issued as to Matthew C. Ryan. (Montgomery, A.)
August 5, 2008 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT [SECOND] against all defendants, filed by Doe 1, Doe 2.(Lemley, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2008: # 1 Second Amended Complaint) (Grady, B.). (Grady, B.). Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
June 20, 2008 50 Featured Case ORDER Granting 49 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/07/2008 To File and Serve Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 6/20/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
June 19, 2008 49 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/07/2008 To File and Serve Second Amended Complaint by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Darling, Rose)
June 16, 2008 Docket Entry Correction: Document 48 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name has been modified to add PDF. (Grady, B.)
June 13, 2008 48 Ruling denying 25 Motion to Quash; 28 Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 06/13/08. (Grady, B.) (Grady, B.).
May 19, 2008 47 Motion to withdraw as attorney by Doe 1, Doe 2, Notice of Change in Counsel, (Ramani, Ashok) Modified event code on 5/20/2008 (Grady, B.). Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
May 11, 2008 46 REPLY to Response to 25 MOTION to Quash filed by AK47. (Williams, John)
May 8, 2008 45 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition To John Doe 21 a/k/a AK47s Motion To Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena, re: 25 MOTION to Quash filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proof of Service)(Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special character text (Grady, B.).
May 5, 2008 44 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: taking under advisement 25 Motion to Quash; taking under advisement 28 Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name; Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2008 re 28 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name filed by AK47, 25 MOTION to Quash filed by AK47. Total Time: 1 hours and 10 minutes(Court Reporter M. Marshall.) (Johnson, D.)
April 21, 2008 43 Featured Case ORDER Granting 41 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2008 To Serve Complaint by Doe 1, Doe 2. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 4/21/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
April 21, 2008 Docket Entry Correction: Document 41 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2008 To Serve Complaint has been modified to add PDF. (Grady, B.)
April 18, 2008 42 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Doe 1, Doe 2 re 41 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2008 To Serve Complaint (Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 4/21/2008 (Grady, B.).
April 18, 2008 41 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2008 To Serve Complaint by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Ramani, Ashok) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Grady, B.).
April 16, 2008 40 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: E-FILE CALENDAR. ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION TO QUASH and MOTION TO PROCEED IN FICTITIOUS NAME is set for 5/5/08 at 11:00 AM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.)
April 16, 2008 39 Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel: John R. Williams for Defendant AK47 for the limited purpose of arguing the motions to quash and to proceed in fictitious name. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 4/16/08. (Droney, Christopher)
April 10, 2008 38 Docket Entry Correction: Documents 19 Amended Complaint; 21 MOTION to Expedite Discovery; (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Expedited Discovery, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedited Discovery, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Doe I, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Doe II, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Doe II (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Mitra (Part 1 of 2), # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Mitra (Part 2 of 2), # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Motion to Substitute She1 lhammer, # 10 Exhibit 1); 26 MOTION to Substitute Party Name
April 7, 2008 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Doe 1, Doe 2 re 36 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Ramani, Ashok)
April 4, 2008 36 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition To John Doe 21's Motion To Proceed Anonymously re 28 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Ramani, Ashok)
March 26, 2008 35 Featured Case ORDER Granting 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 3/26/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
March 25, 2008 34 Featured Case ORDER Granting 26 MOTION to Substitute Party Name. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 3/25/08. (Szczygiel, G.)
March 25, 2008 Docket Entry Correction: Document 29 Notice has been re-entered to use the correct event code. (Grady, B.)
March 24, 2008 Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously, 25 Motion to quash subpoena. Responses due by 4/4/2008 (Grady, B.)
March 24, 2008 32 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to the motion to quash subpoena[doc.#25] and motion to proceed anonymously[doc.#28] by April 4, 2008. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 3/24/08. (Droney, Christopher)
March 19, 2008 Docket Entry Correction: Document 25 MOTION to Quash has been modified to change the docket entry from memorandum in support to a motion to quash. (Grady, B.)
March 18, 2008 33 Memorandum in opposition to 25 Motion to quash subpoena, re: 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Grady, B.)
March 18, 2008 31 AFFIDAVIT re 25 Motion to quash subpoena. Signed By Doe II filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 3/19/2008 to correct linkage (Grady, B.).
March 18, 2008 30 AFFIDAVIT re 25 Motion to quash subpoena. Signed By Steve Mitra filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Supplement 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 3/19/2008 to correct linkage (Grady, B.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2008: # 7 Exhibit 1) (Grady, B.).
March 18, 2008 29 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . NOTICE by Doe 1, Doe 2 re 25 Motion to quash subpoena (Ramani, Ashok) Modified on 3/19/2008 to correct linkage (Grady, B.). Modified on 3/25/2008 (S-Grady, B.).
March 12, 2008 28 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously by AK47. (Grady, B.)
March 7, 2008 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Mitra, Steven)
March 5, 2008 26 MOTION to Substitute Party Name by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Rosen, David) (Grady, B.).
February 25, 2008 25 Motion to quash subpoena, re: 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT, First Amended Complaint, 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by AK47. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Grady, B.) Modified on 3/19/2008 (Grady, B.). Modified on 10/6/2008 top remove special character text (Grady, B.).
February 4, 2008 Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2008 (Grady, B.)
February 4, 2008 24 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2008 to file dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 2/4/08. (Szczygiel, G.) Text modified on 2/6/2008 (Grady, B.).
January 29, 2008 23 Featured Case ORDER re: 21 Motion to Expedite Discovery. This matter has been referred to the undersigned. The undersigned has reviewed the papers submitted and finds that immediate relief is necessary. The plaintiffs may conduct the limited discovery requested. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on January 29, 2008. (Ennis, C.)
January 28, 2008 22 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 21 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Doe 1, Doe 2. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 1/28/08. Motion referred to Thomas P. Smith.(Szczygiel, G.) Modified on 10/6/2008 to remove special characters text (Grady, B.).
January 24, 2008 21 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Doe I, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Doe II, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Doe II (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Mitra. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2008: # 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Doe I, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Doe II, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Doe II (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Mitra, # 7 Affidavit of Steve Mitra Part 1, # 8 Affidavit of Steve Mitra Part 2) (Kunofsky, L.). Modified on 4/11/2008 (Kunofsky, L.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2008: # 9 Proposed Order) (Kunofsky, L.). Modified on 10/6/2008 to correct text (S-D'Onofrio, B.).
January 22, 2008 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2008 to Modify the Scheduling Order by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Rosen, David)
November 8, 2007 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against David Carr, A horse walks into a bar, Whamo, kr0nz, reminderdood, r@ygold, who is, Joe1 Sche11hammer, Prof. Brian Leiter, hitlerhitlerhitler, lonelyvirgin, Patrick Zeke , Patrick Bateman , [DOE 1] got a 157 LSAT, azn, azn, azn, Dirty Nigger, leaf, t14 gunner, kibitzer, yalels2009, AK47, :D, lkjhgf, yalelaw, Spanky, ylsdooder, HI, vincimus, Cheese Eating Surrender Monkey, The Ayatollah of Rock-n-Rollah, DRACULA, Sleazy Z, Ari Gold, Ugly Women, playboytroll, Dean_Harold_Koh, Pauliewalnuts, neoprag, STANFORDtroll, filed by Doe 1, Doe 2.(Lemley, Mark) (Grady, B.). Modified on 4/11/2008 to correct a name (Grady, B.). Modified on 10/6/2008 to edit text to remove special characters.(S-Kunofsky, L.).
November 7, 2007 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 MOTION to admit visiting Attorneys Steven Mitra, Rose Darling, Ashok Ramani and Benjamin Berkowitz. Signed by Clerk on 11/07/07. (Grady, B.)
November 5, 2007 17 MOTION to admit visiting Attorneys Steven Mitra, Rose Darling, Ashok Ramani and Benjamin Berkowitz. Filing Fee $100.00. Receipt Number H023971 by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Steve Mitra# 2 Rose Darling# 3 Ashok Ramani# 4 Benjamin Berkowitz)(Grady, B.)
October 11, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting 15 MOTION for Extension of Time re Third Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines.Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/11/07. (Szczygiel, G.)
October 4, 2007 15 MOTION for Extension of Time re Third Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Lemley, Mark)
September 10, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until October 6, 2007 Modify the Scheduling Order to Amend the Complaint.Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/10/07. (Szczygiel, G.)
September 6, 2007 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until October 6, 2007 Modify the Scheduling Order to Amend the Complaint by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Rosen, David)
August 22, 2007 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time Modify the Scheduling Order by Doe 1, Doe 2. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 8/22/07. (Szczygiel, G.)
August 15, 2007 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Lemley on behalf of Doe 1, Doe 2 (Lemley, Mark)
August 6, 2007 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time Modify the Scheduling Order by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Rosen, David)
August 2, 2007 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy McLaughlin on behalf of Doe 1, Doe 2 (McLaughlin, Dorothy)
July 17, 2007 8 Docket Entry Correction uploaded correct affidavits re 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear to admit visiting attorneys Mark Lemley and Dorothy McLaughlin Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N021691. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Mark Lemley# 2 Affidavit Of Dorothy McLaughlin) (Malone, P.)
July 5, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 MOTION to admit visiting attorneys Mark Lemley and Dorothy McLaughlin pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 07/05/07. (Grady, B.)
June 27, 2007 6 MOTION to admit visiting attorneys Mark Lemley and Dorothy McLaughlin pro hac vice. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N021691, by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mark A. Lemley# 2 Affidavit of Dorothy McLaughlin)(Grady, B.) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2007 (Malone, P.).
June 18, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name. Good cause is found. Defendants may move to reconsider after they have appeared. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 6/18/07. (Droney, Christopher)
June 18, 2007 Docket Entry Correction Corrected party name (Malone, P.)
June 12, 2007 Copyrights Form completed and mailed out on 6/13/07 (Malone, P.)
June 12, 2007 Summons Issued as to Anthony Ciolli. (Malone, P.)
June 8, 2007 4 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name by Doe 1, Doe 2. (Malone, P.)
June 8, 2007 3 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 6/8/07. (Malone, P.)
June 8, 2007 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/8/07.Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2007.,Discovery due by 12/8/2007.,Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2008. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/07. (Malone, P.)
June 8, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against :D, :D (Hillary vs. Jeb '08), MoreDoughHi, Remember when I said I would kill you last? I lied, lkjhgf, yalelaw, Spanky, ylsdooder, Community Norm, HI, David Car (Glass of water for Mr. Grainger), vincimus, Beach Body Brady, Cheese Eating Surrender Monkey, Todd Christopher, A horse walks into a bar (saving one CPGWBT at a time), The Ayatollah of Rock-n-Rollah, DRACULA, Sleazy Z, Whamo (Let me lay it on the line, he had two on the vine), Ari Gold, Ugly Women, playboytroll, Get_to_da_choppa, Dean_Harold_Koh, Anthony Ciolli, Pauliewalnuts, neoprag, STANFORDtroll ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N021508), filed by Doe 1, Doe 2.(Malone, P.) Modified on 6/18/2007 to correct party name.(Malone, P.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Ciolli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: t14 gunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kr0nz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reminderdood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sleazy Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whamo (Let me lay it on the line, he had two on the vine)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: leaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remember when I said I would kill you last? I lied
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lonelyvirgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Zeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK47
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vincimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prof. Brian Leiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hitlerhitlerhitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: who is
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Schellhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: r@ygold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheese Eating Surrender Monkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: azn, azn, azn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirty Nigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: :D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: :D (Hillary vs. Jeb '08)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoreDoughHi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: [DOE 1] got a 157 LSAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ylsdooder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Norm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Car (Glass of water for Mr. Grainger)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get_to_da_choppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean_Harold_Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugly Women
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: playboytroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kibitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yalels2009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ayatollah of Rock-n-Rollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRACULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lkjhgf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yalelaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ciolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauliewalnuts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: neoprag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANFORDtroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spanky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach Body Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A horse walks into a bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A horse walks into a bar (saving one CPGWBT at a time)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe 1
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe 2
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?