Walker v. Chapdelaine et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Walker
Defendant: Chapdelaine, John Aldi and Rivera
Case Number: 3:2016cv01404
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 14 MOTION to Reopen Case, 17 MOTION to Compel, and 18 MOTION for Default; denying as moot 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/24/2017. (Jamieson, K)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 8 MOTION for Reconsideration, 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, and 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 11 MOTION to Advance. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/09/2017. (Jamieson, K)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; VACATING 6 ORDER Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. All further proceedings in the matter shall be held in abeyance for 30 days pending the plaintiff's delivery o f the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 (cash or bank check made payable to the Clerk of Court) to the Clerk's Office, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT 06604. Failure to tender the filing fee within 30 days of this order will result in the dismissal of the action. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/12/2016. (Jamieson, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Chapdelaine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapdelaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Aldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?