In re: Lee
Defendant: Lee
Appellant: Sandra Lee
Undetermined: US Trustee
Interested Party: Michael Dauria
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano
Case Number: 3:2018cv01166
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed (RE:) 109 Notice of Appeal to District Court. Fee Amount of $298 not paid. 107 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case without prejudice For Sandra Lee (RE: 100). Filed by Sandra Lee, Debtor. Appellant, Sandra Lee. Appellee(s), Roberta Napolitano, Trustee. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 7/26/2018. Transmission of Designation due by 8/13/2018. filed by Debtor Sandra Lee. (Fanelle, N.)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Crook on behalf of Roberta Napolitano (Crook, Patrick)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/13/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/13/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A notice of appeal was transmitted to the District Court by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 7/13/2018 and entered on the docket on 7/16/2018 pursuant to the Bankruptcy Rules. The appellant and appellee shall comply with Bankruptcy Rule 8009. Within 14 days, the appellant shall notify this Court either that appellant has filed a designation and statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a)(1)(B), or that the parties have prepared an agreed statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(d), and attach to the notification a copy of such filing. The appellant and appellee shall serve and file their briefs pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 16-20810, filed by Sandra Lee. (Attachments: #1 Order #107)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandra Lee
Represented By: Anthony Steven Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Dauria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano
Represented By: Patrick Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?