In re: Dunne
Defendant: Dunne
Appellee: Mountbrook USA, LLC, Barclay Beattie & Brown, LLC, 151 Milbank, LLC, Heagney Lennon & Slane, LLP, SRQ, LLC, Gayle Killilea, Molly Blossom LLC, TDJ21, LLC, John Dunne and Wahl, LLC
Undetermined: US Trustee
In Re: Sean Dunne
Appellant: Richard M. Coan
Case Number: 3:2018cv01518
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL. The Court GRANTS (Doc. #9 ) the motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal absent objection. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/2/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Richard M. Coan.Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Miltenberger, Timothy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Richard M. Coan of Appellant Designation of the Record (Miltenberger, Timothy)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/19/2018. (Shafer, J.)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Richard M. Coan of Previous Appeal Decided by Judge Meyer (Miltenberger, Timothy)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: CHAMBERS PRACTICES Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 15-05019 13-50484, filed by Richard M. Coan. (Attachments: #1 Order #462) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mountbrook USA, LLC
Represented By: Timothy A. Smith
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barclay Beattie & Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 151 Milbank, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Heagney Lennon & Slane, LLP
Represented By: Philip D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SRQ, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gayle Killilea
Represented By: Timothy A. Smith
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Molly Blossom LLC
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TDJ21, LLC
Represented By: Timothy A. Smith
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Dunne
Represented By: Timothy A. Smith
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wahl, LLC
Represented By: Timothy A. Smith
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Michael D Margulies
Represented By: Alec P. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Sean Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard M. Coan
Represented By: Timothy D. Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?