Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Campos et al

Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Ken Restaurant Group LLC, Natalia Titova Campos and Gaucho Boteco Steakhouse
Case Number: 3:2019cv00411
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Default entered pursuant to Rule 55(a)FRCP. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed by 8/7/2019 or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2019. (Pipech, L.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to as to Defendants, Natalia Titova Campos and Ken Restaurant Group LLC by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lonstein, Wayne)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. As to subpoena to produce documents, information, or objects or to permit inspection of premises in a civil action (Lonstein, Wayne)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Ken Restaurant Group LLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Natalia Titova Campos served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed and E-mail sent to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ken Restaurant Group LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wayne D. Lonstein* *Lonstein Law Office* *80 North Main Street, PO Box 351* *Ellenville, NY 12428*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Natalia Titova Campos* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wayne D. Lonstein* *Lonstein Law Office* *80 North Main Street, PO Box 351* *Ellenville, NY 12428*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Integrated Sports Media, Inc., #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Integrated Sports Media, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 03/19/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019. Discovery due by 9/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 03/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 18, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 18, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to natalia titova campos. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 18, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ken Restaurant Group LLC. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ken Restaurant Group LLC, natalia titova campos ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5197896.), filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons as to Defendant Ken Restaurant Group LLC, #3 Supplement Summons as to Defendant Natalia Campos, #4 Supplement Summons as to Defendant Registered Agent)(Lonstein, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Campos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Restaurant Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalia Titova Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaucho Boteco Steakhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne D. Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?