Darden et al v. Barberino Brothers, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Brenee Darden and Melvin Harrison
Defendant: Barberino Brothers, Incorporated and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00845
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, on consent. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/24/19. (Tooker, A.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration until August 26, 2019 by Barberino Brothers, Incorporated. (Armon, Regina)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 8/19/2019. (Barry, Donna)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time, on consent; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #12 Motion to Compel Arbitration, on consent, to 8/19/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/16/19. (Tooker, A.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration until August 19, 2019 by Barberino Brothers, Incorporated. (Armon, Regina)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after the Court's ruling denying the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 12). hold the Rule 26(f) parties' planning conference. by Brenee Darden, Melvin Harrison. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Brenee Darden, Melvin Harrison.Responses due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Blinn, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time, on consent, to 7/26/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/27/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2019 to respond to complaint #1 Complaint, by Barberino Brothers, Incorporated. (Armon, Regina)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina P Armon on behalf of Barberino Brothers, Incorporated (Armon, Regina)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenee Darden, Melvin Harrison. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenee Darden, Melvin Harrison. Barberino Brothers, Incorporated served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Barberino Brothers, Incorporated, Credit Acceptance Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Brenee Darden, Melvin Harrison, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019 Discovery due by 12/3/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Barberino Brothers, Incorporated. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Application to Compel Arbitration against Barberino Brothers, Incorporated, Credit Acceptance Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5302762.), filed by Brenee Darden, Melvin Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Retail Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit B-AAA Letter)(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darden et al v. Barberino Brothers, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barberino Brothers, Incorporated
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenee Darden
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Harrison
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?