Lugo v. Hannah et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Edgardo and Jorge Edgardo Lugo
Defendant: Adams, A. Hannah, Antonio Santiago and M. Calderon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01270
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to A. Hannah waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
September 27, 2019 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Warden Amonda Hannah, Director Antonio Santiago, Counselor Supervisor Michael Calderon, and MailHandler Delois Adams on 9/27/2019. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *M. Calderon, A. Hannah, Antonio Santiago* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Jorge Edgardo Lugo #269047* *GARNER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION* *50 Nunnawauk Rd, P.O. Box 5500* *Newtown, CT 06470*., USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant(s). (Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 10/16/2019). (Velez, F.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, Counsel for the defendants shall initiate the call with the prison facility. When all parties are on the line, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adjusts the following two dates from the Court's Scheduling Order at Dkt. 9. If no dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 6/1/2020 and Jury Selection will occur on 7/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. All other dates in the Court's Scheduling Order at Dkt. 9 remain the same. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/24/2019. (Nault, James)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 01/09/2019 at 10:30 AM. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 03/22/2020. Dispositive motions are due by 4/21/2020. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 05/01/2020, and jury selection will take place on 06/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 02/01/2021, and jury selection will take place on 03/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month after jury selection is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices -- available on the Court's website -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 02 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/24/2019. (Nault, James)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Re: Initial Discovery Disclosures. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/24/2019. (Shafer, J.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The case may proceed on the First Amendment free exercise claim against the defendants in their individual capacities for damages and in their official capacities for injunctive relief. The RLUIPA claim may proceed against Hannah, Santiago, and Calderon in their official capacities for injunctive relief. The state constitutional claim is dismissed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/24/2019. (Shafer, J.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 8/16/2019. (Payton, R.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge Edgardo Lugo. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/19/2019 to correct filer name(Fazekas, J.).
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Adams, M. Calderon, A. Hannah, Antonio Santiago, filed by Jorge Edgardo Lugo.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/19/2019 to correct plaintiff name (Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. Hannah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Edgardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Edgardo Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?