Backmon v. Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp et al
Plaintiff: Carla Backmon
Defendant: Target Corporation, Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp and Target Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Cases associated. Create association to 3:19-cv-01632-SRU. (Oliver, T.)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to consolidate the case with 19-cv-1632-SRU. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/17/2020. (Simon, K)
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Carla Backmon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/9/2020. (Oliver, T.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc..Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dwyer, Renee)
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc. (Dwyer, Renee)
January 8, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carla Backmon.Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 19 OBJECTION re #4 Notice Statement re: Standing Order in Removal Cases filed by Carla Backmon. (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Carla Backmon. (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTION re #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Carla Backmon. (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carla Backmon. (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Carla Backmon. (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Consent to Electronic Notice by Carla Backmon (Payton, R.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 Appearance Self Represented Party by Carla Backmon (Payton, R.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/2020. (Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/2020.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/2020.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2020. Discovery due by 7/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/12/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/7/2020. (Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp. (Walsh, Kevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp of Civil and Miscellaneous Orders to Counsel Re: Appearance (Walsh, Kevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp Statement re: Standing Order (Walsh, Kevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp of Pending Motions (Walsh, Kevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Walsh on behalf of Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp (Walsh, Kevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp from Superior Court of Stamford at Stamford, case number FST-CV19-5022694-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5624615, filed by Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Summons, Complaint) & B (Notice of Removal to State Court))(Walsh, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backmon v. Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Backmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp
Represented By: Kevin P. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?