Asare v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Rita Asare
Defendant: Target Corporation and Target Corporation doing business as Target Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00040
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A settlement conference set for 3/25/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 258, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Fries, J.)
February 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 2/8/2020. (Fries, J.)
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Rita Asare. (St. Clair, Zisca)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 5/6/2020 at 4:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER:The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #15 and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 05/6/2020 at 4:00 PM. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 8/15/2020. Dispositive motions are due by 9/15/2020. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum (JTM) is due by 10/19/2020, and a bench trial will take place in the month of December 2020 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 06/7/2021, and a bench trial will take place in the month of July 2021 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the bench trial is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #11 --including the deadlines and format of filings--when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than two weeks before the month of trial. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/3/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/31/2020. (Shafer, J.)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Zisca R. St. Clair on behalf of Rita Asare (St. Clair, Zisca)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Target Corporation.(Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #11 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Target Corporation, #10 Standing Protective Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Target Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Target Corporation, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation Signed by Clerk on 01/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/10/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/10/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/10/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2020. Discovery due by 7/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
January 10, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Target Corporation (Certification of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Target Corporation (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Target Corporation (Civil Miscellaneous Notices and Orders) (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Target Corporation of No Pending Motions in State Court (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M. Neborsky on behalf of Target Corporation (Neborsky, Dawn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from JD of Ansonia-Milford at Milford, case number AAN-CV-20-6036676-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5630927, filed by Target Corporation.(Neborsky, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asare v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Asare
Represented By: Zisca R. St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Dawn M. Neborsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation doing business as Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn M. Neborsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?