McCray v. Barone et al
Plaintiff: Daniel McCray
Defendant: Stanley, Barone, Depalma, Roach and Mascenburg
Case Number: 3:2020cv00345
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Dominic J Squatrito
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2020 (Pike, Corinne)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER: The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). The plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint alleging facts showing how each defendant was involved in his claim. The plaintiff also shall indicate whether he was a sentenced inmate or pretrial detainee at the time of the incident. Any amended complaint shall be filed within thirty days from the date of this order. The motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 4] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/20/20. (Payton, R.)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/12/2020.(Bozek, M.)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/12/2020.(Bozek, M.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS - MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Daniel McCray. (Bozek, M.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel McCray. (Bozek, M.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Daniel McCray. (Bozek, M.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Barone, Depalma, Mascenburg, Roach, Stanley, filed by Daniel McCray.(Bozek, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. Barone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mascenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?