Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. v. Bottella et al
Plaintiff: Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. and Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. doing business as Norcom Mortgage
Defendant: Tammy A. Bottella and Law Office of Tammy A. Bottella, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00539
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #7 Electronic Service Documents -- corrected file date. (Velez, F.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Edward Engler on behalf of Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. (Engler, Christopher)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tammy A. Bottella, Law Office of Tammy A. Bottella, P.C.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Adam Schwartz* *Shipman & Goodwin LLP* *One Constitution Plaza* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Velez, F.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Norwich Commercial Group, Inc., #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint filed by Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2020. (Velez, F.) Modified on 4/23/2020 to correct file date (Velez, F.).
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/21/2020. (Velez, F.) Modified on 4/22/2020 to correct file date (Velez, F.).
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/21/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/21/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2020; Discovery due by 10/21/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 21, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 21, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Schwartz, Daniel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norwich Commercial Group, Inc.. (Schwartz, Daniel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tammy A. Bottella, Law Office of Tammy A. Bottella, P.C. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5814795.), filed by Norwich Commercial Group, Inc..(Schwartz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. v. Bottella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy A. Bottella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Tammy A. Bottella, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwich Commercial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher Edward Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. doing business as Norcom Mortgage
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher Edward Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?