Williams v. Easter et al
Petitioner: Bettye Renee Williams
Respondent: Michael Carvajal and Diane Easter
Case Number: 3:2020cv00888
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING #5 Order to Show Cause until such time as the MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/30/2020.(Gould, K.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 7/20/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 6/30/20.(Payton, R.)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. See attached. Show Cause Response due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/29/2020.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bettye Renee Williams. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/1/2020 to edit text (Fazekas, J.).
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus-Compassionate Release and to join the civil class suit 3:20cv569 (MPS), filed by Bettye Renee Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 6/29/2020 to add prefix (Fazekas, J.). Modified on 7/1/2020 to edit text (Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Easter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bettye Renee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?