Vincent v. Bysiewicz et al
Plaintiff: Lisa M Vincent
Defendant: Ned Lamont and Susan Bysiewicz
Case Number: 3:2020cv01196
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Video-conference Motion Hearing held on 9/29/2020 re #3 EXPARTE MOTION. Total Time: 1 hours and 26 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Montini.) (Shaffer, Chelsea)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Motion Hearing set for September 29, 2020 at 11:00 AM will be conducted via Zoom. The public may join by video conference through the Zoom application at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1601690629?pwd=UzdlMXF3YmpHUmtkWUo5WU9PeFQvQT09. The public may also access the proceedings by telephone at 1-646-828-7666, entering meeting ID no. 160 169 0629 when prompted. Meeting password: 252333.Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Perez, J.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 First OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Susan Bysiewicz, Ned Lamont. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Stone, Alayna)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #3 ExParte Motion for a temporary restraining order, as further supported in a Memorandum in support thereof #16 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/10/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea) Modified on 9/10/2020 to edit text (Perez, J.). (Perez, J.). Modified on 9/10/2020 to add document (Perez, J.).
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #3 EXPARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lisa M Vincent. (Fanelle, N.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 EXPARTE MOTION for temporary restraining order. Video-conference Motion Hearing set for September 29, 2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Zoom information to follow. (Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order by September 11, 2020. Plaintiff shall reply to Defendants' response by September 18, 2020. Hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order will be held on September 29, 2020 at 11:00am. The Court reserves judgement on any temporary relief upon further filings by the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/25/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/25/2020. Total Time: 0 hours and 14 minutes (Court Reporter Sharon Montini.) (Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alayna Michelle Stone on behalf of Susan Bysiewicz, Ned Lamont (Stone, Alayna)
August 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for August 25, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Dial: 888-808-6929 Participant Code: 9284309 If you are prompted to enter a security code, please bypass it. (Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Deichert on behalf of Susan Bysiewicz, Ned Lamont (Deichert, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to reach out to any counsel for Defendant and try to agree to a date and time to propose for telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/20/2020.(Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Appearance Self Represented Party filed by Lisa Vincent, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Vincent, #5 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 EXPARTE MOTION filed by Lisa Vincent. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Susan Bysiewicz, Ned Lamont* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Lisa Vincent* *421 West Pearl Road* *Torrington, CT 06790*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Susan Bysiewicz, Ned Lamont. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/17/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/18/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2020 Discovery due by 2/17/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2021 Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lisa Vincent. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Appearance Self Represented Party by Lisa Vincent. (Fanelle, N.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Bysiewicz, Ned Lamont, filed by Lisa Vincent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. Bysiewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned Lamont
Represented By: Alayna Michelle Stone
Represented By: Robert J. Deichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Bysiewicz
Represented By: Alayna Michelle Stone
Represented By: Robert J. Deichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?