Crispin v. Haber et al
Plaintiff: Jossean Crispin
Defendant: John Doe, Ortiz, Haber, Bryer, Kenny and Ramos
Case Number: 3:2020cv01209
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/27/20. (Payton, R.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Docket Entry Correction re #3 Prisoner Authorization Form MODIFIED TO ADD REPLACEMENT PDF TO THE DOCKET ENTRY (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jossean Crispin. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/19/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/19/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 PRISCS - MOTION to Freeze Assets by Jossean Crispin. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 PRISCS - MOTION for Discovery by Jossean Crispin. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS - MOTION for Request for Assistance from the Courts by Jossean Crispin. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Authorization Form by Jossean Crispin. (Oliver, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jossean Crispin. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Bryer, John Doe(#4, Nurse, Kenny, Individual and Official Capacities), John Doe(#2, Correctional Officer, Individual and Official Capacities), John Doe(#3, Correctional Officer, c/o Ortiz, Individual and Official Capacities), John Doe(#1, Correctional Officer, Individual and Official Capacities), Haber, Ramos, filed by Jossean Crispin.(Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crispin v. Haber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jossean Crispin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?