Li v. Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: Dongmei Li
Defendant: State of Connecticut, Dept of Public Health, Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, Richard Colangelo, Joseph T. Corradino, Anthony Formato, Morgan Rhodes, Fairfield Police Dept, Chris Lyddy, Lance Newkirchen, Richard Peck, Fairfield Emergency Communications Center, American Medical Response Inc, Bret Jackson, Mackenzie D'lorio, St. Vincent's Medical Center, Rachel Bouteiller, Fayoia Carmichael, Margaret Chuckta, Kellie Clomiro, Lori Dube, Jingchun Liu, Melissa Ortiz, Bonnie Perez, Nadine Ritt, Jernesha Wright, Clifford Schwartz, Sharon Hasbani, Audrey Harrell, Ryan Liberman, Bujji B. Surapaneni, Dora Orosz, Christopher M. Orelup, Simon A. Ovanessian, Kelechi Ogbonna, Roger Jou, Lei Li, Stephanie A. Sirois, Amanda M. Sandrew, Raj K. Bansal, Miriam E. Delphin-Rittmon, Town of Fairfield, Fairfield Board of Education, Kovacs, James P. Zwally, Cynthia Anderson, Andrea E. Bertolozzi, Cynthia Campbell, Patricia Galich, Barbara Mcconachie, Christine Pannone, James Richards, Rahul Gupta, Bruny Jacques Germain and Lilliana Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2021cv00996
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/18/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Civil litigants, unlike criminal defendants, do not have a constitutional right to the appointment of counsel. See Leftridge v. Connecticut State Trooper Officer No. 1283, 640 F.3d 62, 68 (2d Cir. 2011) ("A party has no constitutionally guaranteed right to the assistance of counsel in a civil case."). Rather, district judges have "[b]road discretion" as to the appointment of counsel in civil proceedings. Hodge v. Police Officers, 802 F.2d 58, 60 (2d Cir. 1986). However, the Second Circuit has "caution[ed] [district courts] against routine appointment of counsel." Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., 877 F.2d 170, 174 (2d Cir. 1989). As a threshold matter, the Court evaluates "whether the indigent's position seems likely to be of substance." Hodge, 802 F.2d at 61. Because the Court has insufficient information to make the threshold determination that Plaintiff's claims are "likely to be of substance," id., the Court denies Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel without prejudice to renewal at a later stage in litigation, see also Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1892 (2016) ("[D]istrict courts have the inherent authority to manage their dockets and courtrooms with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases."). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/2/2021. (Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Order to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/2/2021. (Shaffer, Chelsea)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dongmei Li. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Medical Response Inc, Cynthia Anderson, Raj K. Bansal, Andrea E. Bertolozzi, Rachel Bouteiller, Cynthia Campbell, Fayoia Carmichael, Margaret Chuckta, Kellie Clomiro, Richard Colangelo, State of Connecticut, Joseph T. Corradino, Mackenzie D'lorio, Miriam E. Delphin-Rittmon, Lori Dube, Town of Fairfield, Fairfield Board of Education, Fairfield Emergency Communications Center, Fairfield Police Dept, Anthony Formato, Patricia Galich, Bruny Jacques Germain, Rahul Gupta, Audrey Harrell, Sharon Hasbani, Lilliana Hernandez, Bret Jackson, Roger Jou, Kovacs, Lei Li, Ryan Liberman, Jingchun Liu, Chris Lyddy, Barbara Mcconachie, Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, Lance Newkirchen, Kelechi Ogbonna, Christopher M. Orelup, Dora Orosz, Melissa Ortiz, Simon A. Ovanessian, Christine Pannone, Richard Peck, Bonnie Perez, Dept of Public Health, Morgan Rhodes, James Richards, Nadine Ritt, Amanda M. Sandrew, Clifford Schwartz, Stephanie A. Sirois, St. Vincent's Medical Center, Bujji B. Surapaneni, Jernesha Wright, James P. Zwally* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Dongmei Li* *4539 Black Rock Tpke.* *Fairfield, CT 06824*. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Medical Response Inc, Raj K. Bansal, Rachel Bouteiller, Fayoia Carmichael, Margaret Chuckta, Kellie Clomiro, Richard Colangelo, State of Connecticut, Joseph T. Corradino, Mackenzie D'lorio, Lori Dube, Fairfield Emergency Communications Center, Fairfield Police Dept, Anthony Formato, Audrey Harrell, Sharon Hasbani, Bret Jackson, Roger Jou, Lei Li, Ryan Liberman, Jingchun Liu, Chris Lyddy, Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, Lance Newkirchen, Kelechi Ogbonna, Christopher M. Orelup, Dora Orosz, Melissa Ortiz, Simon A. Ovanessian, Richard Peck, Bonnie Perez, Dept of Public Health, Morgan Rhodes, Nadine Ritt, Amanda M. Sandrew, Clifford Schwartz, Stephanie A. Sirois, St. Vincent's Medical Center, Bujji B. Surapaneni, Jernesha Wright, Miriam E. Delphin-Rittmon, Town of Fairfield, Fairfield Board of Education, Kovacs, James P. Zwally, Cynthia Anderson, Andrea E. Bertolozzi, Cynthia Campbell, Patricia Galich, Barbara Mcconachie, Christine Pannone, James Richards, Rahul Gupta, Bruny Jacques Germain, Lilliana Hernandez, filed by Dongmei Li.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 30, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to American Medical Response Inc, Cynthia Anderson, Raj K. Bansal, Andrea E. Bertolozzi, Rachel Bouteiller, Cynthia Campbell, Fayoia Carmichael, Margaret Chuckta, Kellie Clomiro, Richard Colangelo, State of Connecticut, Joseph T. Corradino, Mackenzie D'lorio, Miriam E. Delphin-Rittmon, Lori Dube, Town of Fairfield, Fairfield Board of Education, Fairfield Emergency Communications Center, Fairfield Police Dept, Anthony Formato, Patricia Galich, Bruny Jacques Germain, Rahul Gupta, Audrey Harrell, Sharon Hasbani, Lilliana Hernandez, Bret Jackson, Roger Jou, Kovacs, Lei Li, Ryan Liberman, Jingchun Liu, Chris Lyddy, Barbara Mcconachie, Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, Lance Newkirchen, Kelechi Ogbonna, Christopher M. Orelup, Dora Orosz, Melissa Ortiz, Simon A. Ovanessian, Christine Pannone, Richard Peck, Bonnie Perez, Dept of Public Health, Morgan Rhodes, James Richards, Nadine Ritt, Amanda M. Sandrew, Clifford Schwartz, Stephanie A. Sirois, St. Vincent's Medical Center, Bujji B. Surapaneni, Jernesha Wright, James P. Zwally. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Protective Order, #6 MOTION for by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing Order filed by Dongmei Li, #5 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Dongmei Li, #1 Complaint, filed by Dongmei Li, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2021. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Dongmei Li. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Electronic Notice by Dongmei Li (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/21/2021. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/21/2021. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/19/2021 Discovery due by 1/20/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2022 Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2021. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Medical Response Inc, Raj K. Bansal, Rachel Bouteiller, Fayoia Carmichael, Margaret Chuckta, Kellie Clomiro, Richard Colangelo, State of Connecticut, Joseph T. Corradino, Mackenzie D'lorio, Lori Dube, Fairfield Emergency Communications Center, Fairfield Police Dept, Anthony Formato, Audrey Harrell, Sharon Hasbani, Bret Jackson, Roger Jou, Lei Li, Ryan Liberman, Jingchun Liu, Chris Lyddy, Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, Lance Newkirchen, Kelechi Ogbonna, Christopher M. Orelup, Dora Orosz, Melissa Ortiz, Simon A. Ovanessian, Richard Peck, Bonnie Perez, Dept of Public Health, Morgan Rhodes, Nadine Ritt, Amanda M. Sandrew, Clifford Schwartz, Stephanie A. Sirois, St. Vincent's Medical Center, Bujji B. Surapaneni, Jernesha Wright, filed by Dongmei Li. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2021 Filing fee received from Dongmei Li: $ 402.00, receipt number CTXB00012289 (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongmei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Public Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T. Corradino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Formato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Lyddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Newkirchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Emergency Communications Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Response Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackenzie D'lorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Vincent's Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Bouteiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayoia Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Chuckta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Clomiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingchun Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Ritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jernesha Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Hasbani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Liberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bujji B. Surapaneni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Orosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Orelup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon A. Ovanessian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelechi Ogbonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Jou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie A. Sirois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda M. Sandrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raj K. Bansal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam E. Delphin-Rittmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Fairfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kovacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Zwally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea E. Bertolozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Galich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Mcconachie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Pannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruny Jacques Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilliana Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?