Nau v. Barone et al
Plaintiff: Richard Nau
Defendant: Kristine Barone, Syed Naqvi, Joseph Roach, William Mulligan, Stanley and Pauline O'Garro
Case Number: 3:2021cv01155
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Reconsideration re 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Richard Nau. (Carr, Dave)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 PARTIAL JUDGMENT.Appeal forms may be obtained at the following website: www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms. Signed by Clerk on 10-27-2021. (Shafer, J.)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff seeks an extension of time to file his notice of appeal from the Court's decision in the #10 Initial Review Order dismissing some but not all of Plaintiff's claims. As detailed in the IRO, Plaintiff brings two categories of claims; the first relating to head shaving and the second relating to a bottom bunk pass. The Court dismissed all claims relating to head shaving, but did permit of claim relating to the bottom bunk pass to proceed. Plaintiff has indicated a desire to appeal the IRO in its entirety. However, no final judgment has been entered for which Plaintiff could appeal as of right. With that said, upon reflection, the Court will grant partial judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) with respect to the head shaving claims as the Court sees no just reason to delay the appeal of those claims as they are factually distinct from the claim set to proceed here. The Clerk is directed to enter partial judgment in favor of Defendants with respect to the head shaving claims. The Court certifies now that an appeal from the head shaving claims would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Due to the procedural complexity to this decision, the Court finds good cause to afford Plaintiff a 30 day extension of time to file a notice of appeal. The notice of appeal is due 11/26/2021. Lastly, with respect to Plaintiff's request for copies of the court rules, the Court does not provide physical copies of court rules to litigants in the ordinary course. Plaintiff is to secure access to the rules by other means. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2021. (Burlingham, Corinne)
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Appeal by Richard Nau. (Carr, Dave)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following case management deadlines consistent with the Courts #10 Initial Review Order. The parties will file a joint discovery status update on the docket on 2/21/2022. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 5/2/2022. Dispositive motions are due by 6/1/2022. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 6/21/2022, and jury selection will take place on 8/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 12/27/2022, and jury selection will take place on 2/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the jury trial is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices available on the Court's website -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket.Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/2021.(Burlingham, Corinne)
October 6, 2021 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Syed Naqvi on 10/6/2021; Waiver of Service due by 11/10/2021. (Velez, F.)
October 6, 2021 Set deadline: joint discovery status report due by 2-21-2022 per Dkt. 12 order. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re: Initial Discovery Disclosures. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10-4-2021. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The case will proceed on the deliberate indifference to medical needs claim against Dr. Naqvi in his individual capacity. All other claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10-4-2021. (Shafer, J.)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 9/29/21. (Payton, R.)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Nau. (Carr, Dave)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Motion to Proceed informa pauperis. ECF No. 2, is deficient in that the amount of the filing fee due has been changed by Mr. Nau from $350.00 to $400.00 on page four Prisoner Authorization Form. The filing fee is $350.00 if the Court grants a plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If the Court denies a plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis, the $402.00 filing ($350.00 plus a $52.00 administrative fee) must be paid all at once. Please submit the attached Prisoner Authorization Form sent to you via U.S. mail If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 9/29/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 9/8/21.(Payton, R.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 08/31/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/31/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/31/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Nau. (Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Nau. (Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Kristine Barone, William Mulligan, Syed Naqvi, Pauline O'Garro, Joseph Roach, Stanley, filed by Richard Nau.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nau v. Barone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline O'Garro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?