USA v. Green et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America and USA
Defendant: Benjamin Green, III, Bianca Burgess, State Tax Collection Agency, 5AIF Nutmeg, LLC and Town of Stratford
Case Number: 3:2022cv00570
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by USA. (Galisewski, Ryan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 18 Appearance Self Represented Party by Bianca Burgess (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Benjamin Green, III. (Oliver, T.)
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Waive Answer by State Tax Collection Agency. (Jackson, Bruce)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 Appearance Self Represented Party by Benjamin Green, III (Oliver, T.)
June 7, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION regarding Lien Priority by State Tax Collection Agency. (Jackson, Bruce)
May 25, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce D. Jackson on behalf of State Tax Collection Agency (Jackson, Bruce)
May 25, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/7/2022 (Guerrier, C.)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Picard on behalf of 5AIF Nutmeg, LLC (Picard, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Benjamin Green, III served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Oliver, T.)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Bianca Burgess served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
May 4, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/6/2022. (Guerrier, C.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Town of Stratford.(Buturla, Richard)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. 5AIF Nutmeg, LLC served on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (Galisewski, Ryan)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Buturla on behalf of Town of Stratford (Buturla, Richard)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2022. (Oliver, T.)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *5AIF Nutmeg, LLC, Bianca Burgess, Benjamin Green, III, State Tax Collection Agency, Town of Stratford* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan D. Galisewski - DOJ-Tax* *P.O. Box 55* *Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044-0055*. (Oliver, T.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/20/2022. (Oliver, T.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/20/2022. (Oliver, T.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/19/2022 Discovery due by 10/20/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2022 Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2022. (Oliver, T.)
April 20, 2022 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States Of America.(Galisewski, Ryan)
April 20, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 5AIF Nutmeg, LLC, Bianca Burgess, Benjamin Green, III, State Tax Collection Agency, Town of Stratford. (Galisewski, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Ryan D. Galisewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Ryan D. Galisewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianca Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Tax Collection Agency
Represented By: Bruce D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5AIF Nutmeg, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Picard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Stratford
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?