Sahin-Ji LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: SAHIB-JI-LLC, Sahin-Ji LLC doing business as Best Deli Food Store and SAHIB-JI LLC
Defendant: United States Of America and USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv01450
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 15 First RESPONSE filed by SAHIB-JI LLC. (Wallace, Anthony)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Government has filed a notice indicating that plaintiff is currently allowed to participate in the SNAP and EBT programs while this suit is pending (Doc. #13), rendering plaintiff's motion to stay moot (Doc. #10). Plaintiff may file a response on the issue of whether its motion to stay is moot by January 10, 2023. Plaintiff's response shall also address the Government's contention that plaintiff has failed to properly serve the Government in the manner required for a lawsuit against the United States government. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/3/2023. (Wang, S.)
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by USA (Meskill, J. Brian)
December 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brian Meskill on behalf of USA (Meskill, J. Brian)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The USA is requested to file any objection or other response to the motion to stay on or before December 12, 2022. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/29/22.(Barry, Donna)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by SAHIB-JI LLC.Responses due by 12/19/2022 (Wallace, Anthony)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAHIB-JI LLC. USA served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Wallace, Anthony)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Anthony A. Wallace* *394 Yale Ave.* *New Haven, CT 06515*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sahin-Ji LLC, filed by Sahin-Ji LLC.(Wallace, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to USA. (Wallace, Anthony)
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Anthony A. Wallace* *394 Yale Ave.* *New Haven, CT 06515*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sahin-Ji LLC Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 16, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to USA. (Wallace, Anthony)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/14/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/14/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2023 Discovery due by 5/16/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2023 Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 14, 2022 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7135606.), filed by Sahin-Ji LLC.(Wallace, Anthony) Modified on 11/15/2022 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahin-Ji LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAHIB-JI-LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahin-Ji LLC doing business as Best Deli Food Store
Represented By: Anthony A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAHIB-JI LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: J. Brian Meskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?